Global patent index - EP 0818640 B1

EP 0818640 B1 2001-01-03 - A phase variator

Title (en)

A phase variator

Title (de)

Eine Phasenverstellvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Un variateur de phase

Publication

EP 0818640 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96201944 A

Priority

EP 96201944 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0818640A1] The single-acting phase variator described comprises a piston actuator (6) movable towards an actuated position, as a result of the admission of a pressurized fluid to a supply chamber (33) through a distribution and discharge duct (55) opening in the chamber with the opposition of resilient means (45) urging the piston (6) towards a non-actuated position; valve means (60) are provided in the variator for connecting the distribution and discharge duct (55) alternatively to a feed duct (51) for the pressurized fluid or to a discharge opening (72) for the rapid discharge of the fluid from the chamber (33). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16H 1/00; F01L 1/344

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/344 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/34406 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0818640 A1 19980114; EP 0818640 B1 20010103; DE 69611440 D1 20010208; DE 69611440 T2 20010823

INPADOC legal status

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69611440

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140201

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120730

- Year of fee payment: 17

2002-03-06 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20010711

2002-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-07-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010711

2001-06-01 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2001-02-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69611440

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-02-08

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2001-01-03 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20010103

2001-01-03 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010103

1998-11-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980929

1998-09-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB

1998-09-23 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

1998-01-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970524

1998-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB