Global Patent Index - EP 0818661 B1

EP 0818661 B1 2002-09-11 - Improved process and apparatus for cooling and liquefaction of natural gas

Title (en)

Improved process and apparatus for cooling and liquefaction of natural gas

Title (de)

Verbessertes Verfahren und Anlage für die Kühlung und Verflüssigung von Erdgas

Title (fr)

Procédé et installation perfectionnés de refroidissement, en particulier pour la liquéfaction de gaz naturel

Publication

EP 0818661 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97401367 A

Priority

FR 9608758 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0818661A1] The method involves compressing a coolant mixture in a pre-final stage (1A) through a series of stages of a compression unit (1). The mixture is condensed partially by cooling, and then is separated to produce a vapour fraction and a liquid fraction. The vapour fraction is cooled and partially condensed, and then passed through a final compression stage (1C) to obtain a high-pressure vapour. Part of the high-pressure vapour fraction and liquid fraction is then cooled, expanded and circulated through a first heat exchanger (5). During the vapour fraction's cooling and partial condensation stage, the vapour fraction obtained from the separation of the condensed mixture is cooled by passing it through a second heat exchanger (18) with the coolant. The condensed mixture is separated in a first separator (14). The vapour fraction from it is condensed in the second heat exchanger, and then passed through a second separator (15) to produce a vapour and a liquid fraction. The vapour fraction is sent to the final compression stage, and the liquid fraction to the first heat exchanger.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25J 3/06; F25J 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25J 1/00 (2006.01); F25J 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25J 1/0022 (2013.01); F25J 1/0042 (2013.01); F25J 1/0055 (2013.01); F25J 1/0092 (2013.01); F25J 1/0212 (2013.01); F25J 1/0214 (2013.01); F25J 1/0215 (2013.01); F25J 1/0262 (2013.01); F25J 1/0268 (2013.01); F25J 1/0279 (2013.01); F25J 1/0291 (2013.01); F25J 1/0292 (2013.01); F25J 2220/64 (2013.01); Y10S 62/912 (2013.01); Y10S 62/913 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0818661 A1 19980114; EP 0818661 B1 20020911; AR 007816 A1 19991124; AT 224036 T 20020915; AU 2496697 A 19980122; AU 723530 B2 20000831; BR 9703959 A 19990316; CA 2209723 A1 19980112; CA 2209723 C 20050524; CN 1140755 C 20040303; CN 1172243 A 19980204; CO 5070650 A1 20010828; DE 69715330 D1 20021017; DE 69715330 T2 20030102; DK 0818661 T3 20030120; DZ 2265 A1 20040704; ES 2185883 T3 20030501; FR 2751059 A1 19980116; FR 2751059 B1 19980925; ID 19101 A 19980611; IL 121092 A 20000716; IL 121092 D0 19971120; JP 4233619 B2 20090304; JP H1068586 A 19980310; KR 100365367 B1 20030219; MY 119081 A 20050331; NO 311461 B1 20011126; NO 973221 A 19980113; NO 973221 D0 19970710; PT 818661 E 20030131; TW 332253 B 19980521; US 5943881 A 19990831

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170617

2018-05-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20180508

2017-11-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170616

2017-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170623

2017-08-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 224036 T

- Effective date: 20170616

2017-08-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170615

2017-07-26 [REG IE MK9A] PATENT EXPIRED

2017-07-05 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170615

2017-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-06-21 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20170615

2017-06-19 [REG DK EUP] EP PATENT EXPIRED

- Effective date: 20170616

2017-06-16 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69715330

2016-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20160601

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160525

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160527

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160526

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160525

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160527

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160525

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160525

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-05-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: GDF SUEZ, FR

- Document: AT 224036 T

- Effective date: 20130328

2011-12-22 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GDF SUEZ S.A., FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GAZ DE FRANCE (SERVICE NATIONAL), PARIS, FR

- Document: DE 69715330

- Effective date: 20111028

2011-12-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69715330

- Representative's name: WSL PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20111028

2011-10-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69715330

- Representative's name: WSL PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFTSGESELLSCHAFT, DE

2010-06-04 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2010-06-04 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2010-06-04 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

2010-02-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: GDF SUEZ

2009-05-29 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: GDF SUEZ SOCIETE ANONYME

- Free text: GAZ DE FRANCE (SERVICE NATIONAL)#23 RUE PHILIBERT-DELORME#F-75017 PARIS (FR) -TRANSFER TO- GDF SUEZ SOCIETE ANONYME#12-26 RUE DU DOCTEUR LANCEREAUX#75008 PARIS (FR)

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-06-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-16 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030616

2003-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2185883 T3

2003-02-04 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020404209

2003-01-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20021210

2003-01-20 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2003-01-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021223

2003-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: LUCHS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69715330 20021017

2002-10-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224036 T 20020915

2000-07-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000529

1998-09-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-09-23 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-08-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980613

1998-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE