Global Patent Index - EP 0818663 B1

EP 0818663 B1 2000-08-16 - Heat exchanger,more particularly radiator

Title (en)

Heat exchanger,more particularly radiator

Title (de)

Wärmetauscher, insbesondere Wasserkühler

Title (fr)

Echangeur de chaleur, en particulier radiateur

Publication

EP 0818663 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97110685 A

Priority

DE 19626639 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0818663A2] The collection boxes (14) are made of plastic and have longitudinal and face walls, a cooling water inlet and an outlet together with a pipe base, in which a number of openings each accommodate a pipe (16). A partition wall (3) is provided in one collecting box and has an inflow aperture (2). A conduit is connected to the inflow aperture of the partition wall, leading to an outlet opening and to a trailing opening. The conduit has another aperture and is provided with a closure plug to shut the outlet aperture and the inflow aperture (2), so that in the area of the outlet aperture and of the head, it seals with a sealing groove and an O-ring.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28D 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28F 9/02 (2006.01); F28F 27/02 (2006.01); F01P 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 27/02 (2013.01); F28F 9/0212 (2013.01); F01P 11/0276 (2013.01); Y10S 165/123 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19626639 C1 19971120; EP 0818663 A2 19980114; EP 0818663 A3 19990526; EP 0818663 B1 20000816; ES 2150176 T3 20001116; US 5915464 A 19990629

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170630

2017-07-26 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170630

2017-07-01 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59702187

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160725

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160725

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160729

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160801

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2150176 T3

2000-10-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000914

2000-09-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-09-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702187 20000921

2000-08-31 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-03-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990722

2000-02-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-09-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990722

1999-07-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990507

1999-06-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MODINE MANUFACTURING COMPANY

1999-06-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

1999-06-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LAENGERER & REICH GMBH

1999-06-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

1999-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-05-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MODINE EUROPE GMBH

1999-05-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

1998-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE