Global Patent Index - EP 0818665 B1

EP 0818665 B1 2001-05-23 - Protecting device for door slots of a specially protected armoured vehicle

Title (en)

Protecting device for door slots of a specially protected armoured vehicle

Title (de)

Schutzeinrichtung für einen Türspalt bei einem gepanzerten Sonderschutzfahrzeug

Title (fr)

Dispositif de protection pour fente de porte d'un véhicule blindé à protection spéciale

Publication

EP 0818665 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97109358 A

Priority

DE 19628065 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0818665A1] The device has a protective profile (4) extending into the door gap (3), forming the inner edge of the door panel (1). At the centre of the depth of the door gap and from the door panel, a protective strip (6) extends, parallel to the plane of the door opening in the door gap and does not completely extend in the gap in this direction. On the vehicle bodywork side, the facing end of the gap is at least partly covered by an armoured plate (7) running from the door frame parallel to the door opening. The section of the protective profile of the door panel extending into the door gap, covers a part area of the depth of the gap. A shrapnel protection strip (8) is fitted on the part of the protective profile engaging around the interior of the door panel, from the sides of the vehicle interior, extending over the edge of the protective profile within the depth of the door gap.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41H 7/02; F41H 5/22; F41H 5/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41H 5/22 (2006.01); F41H 5/26 (2006.01); F41H 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41H 7/04 (2013.01); F41H 5/22 (2013.01); F41H 5/226 (2013.01); F41H 5/26 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0818665 A1 19980114; EP 0818665 B1 20010523; DE 19628065 A1 19980115; DE 19628065 C2 19980604; US 5808228 A 19980915

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *DAIMLERCHRYSLER A.G.

- Effective date: 20060630

2007-04-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-02-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060610

2007-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070103

2006-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060610

2005-07-04 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050704

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-06-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050613

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-06-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050610

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050531

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-08-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010803

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703583 20010628

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

1999-08-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990624

1999-04-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

1998-09-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB

1998-09-23 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

1998-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971217

1998-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB