Global Patent Index - EP 0818800 B1

EP 0818800 B1 2001-12-19 - Color cathode ray tube

Title (en)

Color cathode ray tube

Title (de)

Farbkathodenstrahlröhre

Title (fr)

Tube à rayons cathodiques couleur

Publication

EP 0818800 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97111545 A

Priority

JP 18316096 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0818800A1] A shadow mask opposing a phosphor screen includes a substantially rectangular mask body (27) having a number of electron beam passage holes, and a substantially rectangular mask frame (30) having four side walls (28L, 28S) supporting a periphery of the mask body. Among the side walls, a pair of the side walls (28L) on long side each has a central connecting portion (32a) which is provided in a central portion thereof in lengthwise direction and fixed to the mask body, and a pair of protruding portions (34) which are provided on both sides of the central connecting portion in the lengthwise direction and protrudes in a direction apart from the mask body. Each protruding portion defines a gap (36) between the side wall and the mask body, and a width of the gap gradually increases as it goes far from the central connecting portion. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 29/07

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 29/07 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 29/073 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0818800 A1 19980114; EP 0818800 B1 20011219; CN 1084523 C 20020508; CN 1170952 A 19980121; DE 69709257 D1 20020131; DE 69709257 T2 20020814; KR 100239244 B1 20000115; MY 118882 A 20050228; TW 388050 B 20000421

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080708

2009-05-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090203

2009-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080708

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070710

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070704

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-07-05 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070705

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69709257 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-01-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991119

1998-09-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

1998-09-23 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-01-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970805

1998-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB