Global patent index - EP 0818848 A3

EP 0818848 A3 2000-01-12 - Active receiving antenna

Title (en)

Active receiving antenna

Title (de)

Aktive Empfangsantenne

Title (fr)

Antenne réceptrice active

Publication

EP 0818848 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97111125 A

Priority

DE 19628125 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0818848A2] The slot antenna (1) is terminated at the rear by a hollow chamber filled with a dielectric. The antenna is connected via leads (L1,L2), which provide a phase correction, to a low noise preamplifier (LNA) which provides an output to the slotted structure. A defined phase angle for the received waves can be set up by using different lengths for the leads. The preamplifier and the leads are arranged inside the hollow chamber.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 23/00; H01Q 1/32; H01Q 13/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/32 (2006.01); H01Q 13/10 (2006.01); H01Q 23/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 13/10 (2013.01); H01Q 1/3275 (2013.01); H01Q 23/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0818848 A2 19980114; EP 0818848 A3 20000112; EP 0818848 B1 20040303; DE 19628125 A1 19980115; US 5905471 A 19990518

INPADOC legal status

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100703

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100802

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100703

2011-05-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59711355

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100703

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090725

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090722

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090720

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090716

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-03-20 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2005-02-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041206

2004-11-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040607

2004-06-14 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040614

2004-06-03 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040603

2004-04-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59711355

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20040408

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2004-03-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-05-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: CONTI TEMIC MICROELECTRONIC GMBH

2002-05-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

2002-05-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: CONTI TEMIC MICROELECTRONIC GMBH

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000226

2000-01-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: 7H 01Q 23/00 A, 7H 01Q 13/10 B, 7H 01Q 1/32 B, 7H 01Q 13/18 B

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-04-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

1998-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE