Global Patent Index - EP 0818850 B1

EP 0818850 B1 2001-05-23 - Electrical connection device of terminal type

Title (en)

Electrical connection device of terminal type

Title (de)

Elektrische Anschlussvorrichtung vom Kabelschuhtyp

Title (fr)

Dispositif de raccordement électrique du type à cosse

Publication

EP 0818850 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97401633 A

Priority

FR 9608769 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0818850A1] The anti-rotation terminal spade has a circular section (1) with a central hole which can be screwed in position. The section extends to hold a wire end (3). The circular section has part of the circumference with a smaller diameter than the other part. A lower section has protruding wings (8) which come up against the shoulders (12,13) formed by the tag. This construction prevents tag rotation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/30; H01R 11/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/30 (2006.01); H01R 11/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/305 (2013.01); H01R 11/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES GB IT LI PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0818850 A1 19980114; EP 0818850 B1 20010523; DE 69704907 D1 20010628; FR 2751139 A1 19980116; FR 2751139 B1 19981113

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-11-21 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-08-24 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010824

2001-08-23 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010823

2001-08-23 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010823

2001-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69704907 20010628

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI PT SE

2001-05-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-05-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010523

1999-11-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990924

1998-09-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES GB IT LI PT SE

1998-09-23 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI PT SE

1998-08-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980613

1998-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI PT SE