Global Patent Index - EP 0818961 B1

EP 0818961 B1 2003-06-04 - TOBACCO PRODUCT FOR A HOME-MADE CIGARETTE, IN PARTICULAR A FILTER CIGARETTE

Title (en)

TOBACCO PRODUCT FOR A HOME-MADE CIGARETTE, IN PARTICULAR A FILTER CIGARETTE

Title (de)

TABAKERZEUGNIS FÜR DIE SELBSTVERFERTIGUNG EINER ZIGARETTE, INSBESONDERE FILTER-ZIGARETTE

Title (fr)

PRODUIT DE TABAC PERMETTANT DE CONFECTIONNER SOI-MEME UNE CIGARETTE, NOTAMMENT UNE CIGARETTE FILTRE

Publication

EP 0818961 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96910027 A

Priority

  • DE 19513010 A
  • EP 9601495 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19513010A1] The invention concerns a tobacco product for a home-made cigarette, in particular a filter cigarette. The product consists of a portion of tobacco (11) matched to the filling of a ready-made cigarette and to the cross-section and length of the tobacco cavity of a cigarette paper tube and held together by a sleeve section (10). The sleeve section (10) is either wound loosely around the tobacco portion (11) or gummed lightly, e.g. at isolated points, along its two overlapping long edges (12, 13). A tab (15) is provided on the sleeve section (10), in particular on the outer long edge (13), for removing the sleeve section (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A24C 5/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A24C 5/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A24C 5/40 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK ES FR GB GR LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19513010 A1 19961010; DE 19513010 B4 20040429; AT 241919 T 20030615; AU 5334996 A 19961023; CA 2217605 A1 19961010; CA 2217605 C 20010327; DK 0818961 T3 20030915; EP 0818961 A1 19980121; EP 0818961 B1 20030604; ES 2194982 T3 20031201; WO 9631135 A1 19961010

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150430

2016-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150405

2016-05-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160526

2016-04-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150430

2016-03-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150501

2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150430

2016-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150404

2016-02-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150405

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150404

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151103

2016-01-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151231

2016-01-06 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150501

2015-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150404

2015-12-15 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 241919 T

- Effective date: 20150404

2015-11-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150404

2015-11-23 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20150430

2015-11-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59610505

2014-09-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20140422

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20140418

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-08-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140424

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140422

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-08-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140418

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-08-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20140418

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140418

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140411

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140422

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-05-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20140430

- Year of fee payment: 19

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-03-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-09-15 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-09-04 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030904

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59610505 P 20030710

2003-06-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-06-10 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FR GB GR LU NL SE

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-04-12 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT

- Owner name: THE HOUSE OF EDGEWORTH INCORPORATED

2000-03-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: THE HOUSE OF HEDGEWORTH INCORPORATED

1998-01-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970919

1998-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FR GB GR LU NL SE