Global patent index - EP 0819087 B1

EP 0819087 B1 2000-01-26 - PROTECTIVE COMPONENT TO BE FITTED ON OR IN A ROD-LIKE OBJECT

Title (en)

PROTECTIVE COMPONENT TO BE FITTED ON OR IN A ROD-LIKE OBJECT

Title (de)

SCHUTZELEMENT ZUM AUF- ODER EINSCHIEBEN AUF BZW. IN EIN STABFÖRMIGES TEIL

Title (fr)

ELEMENT PROTECTEUR A FAIRE GLISSER SUR OU A INSERER DANS UNE PIECE NOTAMMENT EN FORME DE BARRE

Publication

EP 0819087 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96908014 A

Priority

  • DE 9600603 W
  • DE 29505964 U
  • DE 19520259 A
  • DE 19608107 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9631407A1] A protective component to be fitted on or in an especially rod-like object (1) with springy longitudinal blades (2) on its inner or outer wall is to be rationally producible and usable. To this end the protective component with its blades is axially open at both ends. In addition, a protective component in the form of a protective sleeve can be opened in order to be able to be pushed transversely on a rod-like object (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 59/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 59/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 59/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9631407 A1 19961010; AT 189173 T 20000215; DE 19680215 D2 19980319; EP 0819087 A1 19980121; EP 0819087 B1 20000126

INPADOC legal status

2003-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031101

2003-04-04 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030404

2002-04-25 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020425

- Year of fee payment: 07

2002-03-15 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020315

- Year of fee payment: 07

2001-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2000-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000430

2000-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000430

2000-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59604302

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000302

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2000-01-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 189173

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 20000215

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

1998-12-30 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

1998-12-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981019

1998-01-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970925

1998-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI