Global Patent Index - EP 0819185 B1

EP 0819185 B1 2000-12-06 - METHOD FOR PREPARING A FILM CONSISTING OF AN OXIDE OR HYDROXIDE OF AN ELEMENT IN COLUMNS II OR III OF THE PERIODIC TABLE, AND COMPOSITE STRUCTURES INCLUDING SUCH A FILM

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PREPARING A FILM CONSISTING OF AN OXIDE OR HYDROXIDE OF AN ELEMENT IN COLUMNS II OR III OF THE PERIODIC TABLE, AND COMPOSITE STRUCTURES INCLUDING SUCH A FILM

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES FILMS AUS DEN OXID ODER HYDROXID EINES ELEMENTS DER GRUPPEN II ODER III DES PERIODENSYSTEMS SOWIE DIE KOMPOSITSTRUKTUREN MIT EINEM SOLCHEN FILM

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'UN FILM D'OXYDE OU D'HYDROXYDE D'UN ELEMENT DES COLONNES II OU III DE LA CLASSIFICATION, ET LES STRUCTURES COMPOSITES COMPRENANT UN TEL FILM

Publication

EP 0819185 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96911017 A

Priority

  • FR 9600495 W
  • FR 9504088 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9631638A1] A method enabling a film consisting of an oxide or hydroxide of a species selected from the elements in columns II or III of the periodic table to be deposited on a substrate in an electrochemical cell that includes an electrode consisting of said substrate. According to the method, oxygen is dissolved in the electrolyte, and a cathode potential lower than the oxygen reduction potential and higher than the deposition potential of metal M in the electrolyte in question is imparted to the electrochemical cell. The method is suitable for preparing composite structures that are particularly useful as transparent electrodes in photovoltaic cells.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25D 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25D 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25D 9/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9631638 A1 19961010; DE 69611162 D1 20010111; DE 69611162 T2 20010607; EP 0819185 A1 19980121; EP 0819185 B1 20001206; FR 2732696 A1 19961011; FR 2732696 B1 19970620; US 6030517 A 20000229

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160401

2016-04-27 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20160401

2016-04-02 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69611162

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150324

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-03-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010116

2001-01-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69611162 20010111

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-12-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001206

2000-04-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980220

1998-04-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980220

1998-01-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971022

1998-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT