Global Patent Index - EP 0819188 B1

EP 0819188 B1 2000-06-21 - METHOD OF WEAVING A THREE-DIMENSIONALLY SHAPED FABRIC ZONE

Title (en)

METHOD OF WEAVING A THREE-DIMENSIONALLY SHAPED FABRIC ZONE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM WEBEN EINER DREI-DIMENSIONAL GEFORMTEN GEWEBEZONE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE TISSAGE D'UNE ZONE DE TISSU FACONNEE A TROIS DIMENSIONS

Publication

EP 0819188 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96911971 A

Priority

  • DE 19512554 A
  • DE 19540628 A
  • EP 9601397 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9631643A1] During the weaving process the number of stitchers is altered in areas of the fabric by changing the weave type and/or incorporating additional yarns. The resulting increase in surface area causes the affected fabric zone to bulge outwards and results in an adjustable, i.e. homogenous, yarn density. Technical and textile fabrics with adjustable fabric characteristics (e.g. with respect to filtration, air resistance, optical or mechanical properties) can be produced. The warp yarns are drawn off individually or in groups at differing and variable speeds.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 13/00; D03D 25/00; D03D 41/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60R 21/16 (2006.01); A61F 5/01 (2006.01); D03D 1/00 (2006.01); D03D 13/00 (2006.01); D03D 25/00 (2006.01); D03D 41/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 3/08 (2013.01); D03D 13/004 (2013.01); D03D 13/008 (2013.01); D03D 25/005 (2013.01); D03D 41/004 (2013.01); Y10S 139/01 (2013.01); Y10T 428/1334 (2013.01); Y10T 428/1345 (2013.01); Y10T 428/1362 (2013.01); Y10T 442/322 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9631643 A1 19961010; AT 194019 T 20000715; CN 1183123 A 19980527; EP 0819188 A1 19980121; EP 0819188 B1 20000621; JP H11505296 A 19990518; US 6000442 A 19991214

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-24 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20060124

2006-05-24 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPR

- Free Format Text: 20060124

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-02-22 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BUESGEN, ALEXANDER

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2006-02-22 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN2

- Inventor name: BUESGEN, ALEXANDER

2005-04-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050425

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-04-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050419

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-04-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050414

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-04-13 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION

- Effective date: 20010321

2004-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040329

2003-04-25 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030425

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-04-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030424

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-23 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION

- Effective date: 20010321

2000-10-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-09-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: PORTA CHECCACCI & ASSOCIATI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-08-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-07-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59605463

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-27

2000-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-06-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 194019

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-07-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990611

1998-01-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971027

1998-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI