Global Patent Index - EP 0819198 B1

EP 0819198 B1 2000-08-02 - FLOATING SKIMMER

Title (en)

FLOATING SKIMMER

Title (de)

SELBSTSCHWIMMENDES ABSCHÖPFGERÄT

Title (fr)

ECUMEUSE FLOTTANTE

Publication

EP 0819198 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96908017 A

Priority

  • DE 9600606 W
  • DE 19512279 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19512279A1] A floating skimmer (3) which takes up the surface layer of a liquid medium in which it is floating has floats (12) and an outflow to discharge the medium taken up. In order to provide a simply constructed, automatically operating skimmer, a skimming trough (11) to take up the skimmed medium is fitted between at least two floats (12) at a fixed distance from each other to pivot through a limited angle about a spindle (14) between the floats (12).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02B 15/04; B01D 17/032

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02B 15/04 (2006.01); E02B 15/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02B 15/106 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19512279 A1 19961002; DE 19512279 C2 19970911; AT 195158 T 20000815; AU 5142796 A 19961023; DK 0819198 T3 20001113; EP 0819198 A1 19980121; EP 0819198 B1 20000802; WO 9631662 A1 19961010

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070402

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080523

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2008-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2008-01-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20071130

2007-11-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070327

2007-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061001

2006-11-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060327

2006-10-30 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2006-10-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061001

2006-04-25 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060425

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-03-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-03-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-03-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060327

2005-04-25 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050425

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-03-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050327

2005-03-23 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20050323

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-03-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050322

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-11-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001027

2000-11-13 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PA ALDO ROEMPLER

2000-10-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO MASSARI S.R.L.

2000-09-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605679 20000907

2000-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL

2000-08-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 195158 T 20000815

1999-12-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991018

1998-01-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970925

1998-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL