Global Patent Index - EP 0819202 B1

EP 0819202 B1 2000-01-19 - A method for fastening a sealing foil to an underlying structure and a non-penetrating fastening system in accordance with said method

Title (en)

A method for fastening a sealing foil to an underlying structure and a non-penetrating fastening system in accordance with said method

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Befestigen einer Abdichtungsfolie auf einer Unterkonstruktion und ein nicht-durchdringendes Befestigungssystem nach diesem Verfahren

Title (fr)

Procédé de fixation d'une feuille d'étanchéité à une structure sous-jacente et système de fixation non pénétrant obtenu selon ledit procédé

Publication

EP 0819202 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96907790 A

Priority

  • NL 9600143 W
  • NL 1000032 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9631670A1] A method for fastening a sealing foil (4) to an underlying structure (1). Before the sealing foil is provided, bonding elements (2) are provided on or in the underlying structure. In many cases gravel or the like is provided on the sealing foil with a view to weighting said sealing foil. The use of a thermal adhesive element as the fixing means and a proper heat-conducting foil as the sealing foil makes it possible to make the joint between bonding element and sealing foil after the sealing foil has been provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 5/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 5/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 5/149 (2013.01); E04D 5/143 (2013.01); E04D 5/145 (2013.01); E04D 5/147 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9631670 A1 19961010; AT 189025 T 20000215; AU 5126096 A 19961023; DE 69606287 D1 20000224; DE 69606287 T2 20000831; EP 0819202 A1 19980121; EP 0819202 B1 20000119; NL 1000032 C2 19961007

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-02 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20020619

2002-09-11 [RTI2] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: A METHOD FOR FASTENING A SEALING FOIL TO AN UNDERLYING STRUCTURE AND A NON-PENETRATING FASTENING SYSTEM IN ACCORDANCE WITH SAID METHOD

2002-08-07 [RTI2] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: A METHOD FOR FASTENING A SEALING FOIL TO AN UNDERLYING STRUCTURE AND A NON-PENETRATING FASTENING SYSTEM IN ACCORDANCE WITH SAID METHOD

2002-01-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20011101

2001-12-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-11-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011101

2001-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: VAN BEEK BEHEER B.V.

- Effective date: 20010430

2001-05-03 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010503

2001-05-03 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010503

2001-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010430

2001-04-11 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010411

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-04-04 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010404

2001-02-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: PRELASTI S.A.

2000-12-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: PRELASTI S.A.

- Effective date: 20001017

2000-12-06 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20000419

2000-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2000-06-16 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-05-25 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20000525

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-05-03 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20000503

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-04-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20000428

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-04-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000419

2000-04-19 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000419

2000-04-17 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20000417

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69606287 20000224

2000-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-01-19 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-01-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-01-19 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-01-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-01-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 189025 T 20000215

1999-09-29 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: A METHOD FOR FASTENING A SEALING FOIL TO AN UNDERLYING STRUCTURE AND A NON-PENETRATING FASTENING SYSTEM IN ACCORDANCE WITH SAID METHOD

1999-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990602

1998-01-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971029

1998-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE