Global Patent Index - EP 0819213 B1

EP 0819213 B1 2000-05-03 - DEVICE FOR DETECTING A LEAK IN A FUEL-SUPPLY SYSTEM

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR DETECTING A LEAK IN A FUEL-SUPPLY SYSTEM

Title (de)

EINRICHTUNG ZUR ERKENNUNG EINES LECKS IN EINEM KRAFTSTOFFVERSORGUNGSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

DETECTEUR DE FUITE DANS UN SYSTEME D'ALIMENTATION EN CARBURANT

Publication

EP 0819213 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96902879 A

Priority

  • DE 9600273 W
  • DE 19513158 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19513158A1] Described is a device for detecting a leak in a fuel-supply system, the device measuring the fuel-pressure gradient after the fuel pump has been switched off and indicating the presence of a leak if the over pressure in part of the fuel-supply system drops more rapidly than expected.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 65/00; F02B 77/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 63/00 (2006.01); F02B 77/08 (2006.01); F02M 63/02 (2006.01); F02M 65/00 (2006.01); F02M 69/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 65/006 (2013.01); F02B 77/088 (2013.01); F02M 63/0205 (2013.01); F02M 63/0225 (2013.01); F02M 65/00 (2013.01); F02M 69/462 (2013.01); F02D 2041/225 (2013.01); F23N 2031/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19513158 A1 19961010; CN 1066242 C 20010523; CN 1181125 A 19980506; EP 0819213 A1 19980121; EP 0819213 B1 20000503; JP 3856827 B2 20061213; JP H11503503 A 19990326; KR 100413559 B1 20040331; US 5974865 A 19991102; WO 9631693 A1 19961010

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140222

2015-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-12-04 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59605135

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-11-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20141031

2014-09-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59605135

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130426

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130315

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120224

- Year of fee payment: 17

2001-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-07-13 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59605135

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-08

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

1999-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990618

1998-01-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971107

1998-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT