Global Patent Index - EP 0819214 B1

EP 0819214 B1 2000-03-29 - IGNITION DEVICE FOR A MULTICYLINDER INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

IGNITION DEVICE FOR A MULTICYLINDER INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

ZÜNDVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE MEHRZYLINDER-BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ALLUMAGE POUR MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE MULTICYLINDRE

Publication

EP 0819214 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96945837 A

Priority

  • DE 9602048 W
  • DE 19604105 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19604105A1] An ignition device (11) for a multicylinder internal combustion engine must be designed so that it is operationally reliable under shaking accelerations of the internal combustion engine. The ignition device (11) has rod-shaped ignition coils (12) corresponding to the number of cyclinders of the internal combustion engine. An end section (22) of each ignition coil (12) is formed by a part of a core (23) of the ignition coil (12) projecting from a housings (20) of the ignition coil (12). A buffer is arranged on this. The other end section (21) of the ignition coil (12) is formed by a high voltage dome (27) which is contained in a socket (39) of elastic material supported in the spark plug bore (15) of a cylinder head (13) of the internal combustion engine. The ignition device (11) is maintained elastically tensioned at the two end sections (21, 22) in the cylinder head (13) of the internal combustion engine by a retaining element (33). The high voltage transmission to an associated ignition coil (16) is effected in a flexible manner through a high voltage contact element (48) which is designed as a spring.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02P 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02P 7/03 (2006.01); F02P 3/02 (2006.01); F02P 15/00 (2006.01); H01F 38/12 (2006.01); H01T 13/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01T 13/06 (2013.01); F02P 3/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19604105 A1 19970807; BR 9604941 A 19980609; EP 0819214 A1 19980121; EP 0819214 B1 20000329; JP H11504412 A 19990420; US 5890473 A 19990406; WO 9729280 A1 19970814

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051028

2002-08-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-07-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020702

2002-06-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020628

2002-06-19 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20011028

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011028

2001-03-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-15 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20001215

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-10-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20001020

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-10-17 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20001017

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-07-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000602

2000-06-15 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604841 20000504

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990621

1998-04-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980216

1998-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT