Global Patent Index - EP 0819325 B1

EP 0819325 B1 2000-06-28 - FLAT CABLE PLUG CONNECTOR

Title (en)

FLAT CABLE PLUG CONNECTOR

Title (de)

BANDKABEL-STECKVERBINDUNGSANORDNUNG

Title (fr)

CONNECTEUR A FICHES POUR CABLE PLAT

Publication

EP 0819325 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96909145 A

Priority

  • DE 19512788 A
  • EP 9601375 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9631920A1] A flat cable plug connector with a strip cable end having a locking rib (33) and a plug connector housing (31) having a cable insertion aperture (43) and an adjacent flexibly sprung locking arm (47) with a locking shoulder (51) engaging with the locking rib (33).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 12/08; B60R 16/02; G01R 1/04; H01R 12/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/70 (2011.01); H01R 13/627 (2006.01); H01R 13/639 (2006.01); H01R 12/79 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/7023 (2013.01); H01R 12/79 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9631920 A1 19961010; AR 001512 A1 19971022; AU 5275296 A 19961023; DE 19512788 A1 19961031; DE 19512788 C2 19970227; EP 0819325 A1 19980121; EP 0819325 B1 20000628; ES 2150668 T3 20001201; IL 117569 A 19991028; IL 117569 D0 19960723; JP 3529789 B2 20040524; JP H11503269 A 19990323; TW 311294 B 19970721; US 5921808 A 19990713

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040329

2005-03-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050328

2005-01-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-17 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040328

2004-11-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-10-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: W.L. *GORE & ASSOCIATES G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040329

2004-03-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040329

2004-03-28 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040328

2004-03-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040328

2003-04-08 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030408

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-04-01 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030401

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-03-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030331

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-03-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030319

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-03-06 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20030306

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-03-05 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030305

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-03-05 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030305

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-03-04 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030304

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2150668 T3

2000-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000727

2000-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605509 20000803

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

2000-06-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 12/08 A, 7H 01R 12/24 B, 7B 60R 16/02 B, 7G 01R 1/04 B

1999-10-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BOTTI & FERRARI S.R.L.

1998-06-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980423

1998-01-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971016

1998-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE