Global Patent Index - EP 0819527 B1

EP 0819527 B1 2000-05-10 - Ink jet nozzle head with multiple block structure

Title (en)

Ink jet nozzle head with multiple block structure

Title (de)

Tintenstrahldüsenkopf mit mehrfacher Blockstruktur

Title (fr)

Tête à buse à jet d'encre avec une structure de bloc multiple

Publication

EP 0819527 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97202040 A

Priority

  • EP 97202040 A
  • EP 96202044 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0819527A1] Ink jet nozzle head comprising: a channel plate (12) defining a linear array of equidistant nozzles (14) and a number of parallel ink channels (16) each connected to a respective one of the nozzles, and a comb-like array of fingers (26, 28) disposed on one side of the channel plate (12) such that the fingers project towards the nozzle plate, some of the fingers (26) being configured as actuators for exerting mechanical strokes on the ink contained in the ink channels, so as to expel ink droplets from the nozzles, at least one actuator being provided for each nozzle, the other fingers (28) serving as support members for supporting the actuators at the channel plate and receiving the reaction forces of the actuators, characterized in that the fingers (26, 28) constitute a plurality of separate blocks (30), each block comprising one actuator (26) and one or two support members (28). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/045; B41J 2/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/14274 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0819527 A1 19980121; EP 0819527 B1 20000510

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140707

2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140731

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-04-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69701930

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-04-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150331

2015-03-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150201

2015-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140707

2015-02-25 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150201

2015-02-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69701930

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130719

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130722

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130712

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130722

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-07-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050707

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-25 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-06-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69701930 20000615

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1999-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990701

1998-09-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT NL

1998-09-30 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1998-09-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980721

1998-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1998-01-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI