Global Patent Index - EP 0819604 B1

EP 0819604 B1 2002-09-25 - Strap guiding frame for a strapping machine

Title (en)

Strap guiding frame for a strapping machine

Title (de)

Bandführungsrahmen für eine Umreifungsmaschine

Title (fr)

Châssis de guidage de bande pour une machine de cerclage

Publication

EP 0819604 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97110999 A

Priority

DE 29612531 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5778772A] In a strap guiding frame for a looping machine, comprising a frame base and an encircling strap channel for a looping strap to be guided around a product stack, the strap channel being formed on the frame base by a guide bar, which is located on the frame base and defines the strap channel externally, and by a movable cover, which defines the strap channel internally toward the product stack and which is composed of a plurality of overlapping lamellae lined up in the direction of circulation of the looping strap, the lamellae being spring-mounted on the frame base in such a way that when the looping strap is tautened around the product stack, they can be lifted off the frame base for the automatic opening of the strap channel, it is provided, with a view to constructionally simplify the spring-mounting of the lamellae without impairing their impeccable opening and closing behavior, that the spring-mounting of the lamellae is formed by a rubber-elastic spring plate, which is supported on an associated support located on the frame base, and on which the lamella is suspended.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 13/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 13/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 13/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29612531 U1 19960912; EP 0819604 A1 19980121; EP 0819604 B1 20020925; US 5778772 A 19980714

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170201

2017-04-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160731

2017-04-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160731

2017-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-02-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59708305

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150918

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150612

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-02-13 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130201

2011-12-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110725

- Year of fee payment: 15

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708305 20021031

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE LI NL

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020128

1998-09-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE LI NL

1998-09-30 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH DE LI NL

1998-04-22 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-03-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980114

1998-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE LI NL