Global Patent Index - EP 0819609 B1

EP 0819609 B1 2000-01-19 - Conveyor for transporting containers

Title (en)

Conveyor for transporting containers

Title (de)

Fördereinrichtung zum Transport von Behältern

Title (fr)

Convoyeur pour transporter des récipients

Publication

EP 0819609 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97202144 A

Priority

JP 18520596 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0819609A1] A container transport conveyor comprises a plurality of holders 64 capable of holding high and low two kinds of containers having the same cross sectional area, and attachments 65 equal in number to the number of holders 64 and removably mountable on the respective holders 64. Each of the holders 64 comprises a flat bottom plate 81 for supporting the bottom of the container thereon, and a flat side plate 82 orthogonal to the upper surface of the bottom plate. The height of the side plate 82 as measured from the upper surface of the bottom plate is equal to the height of the low container. The attachment 65 has a height equal to the difference between the high and low containers in height. The side plate 82 is formed in its top with an engaging bore 83. A ball plunger 85 is accommodated within a peripheral wall defining the engaging bore 83 and has a ball partly projectable into the engaging bore. The attachment 65 has an insert rod 88 extending downward from its bottom face and withdrawably insertable into the engaging bore 83. The insert rod 88 is formed in its outer peripheral surface with an engaging recess 91 for the ball to fit in. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 59/00; B65B 61/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 59/02 (2006.01); B65B 59/00 (2006.01); B65B 61/24 (2006.01); B67C 3/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 61/24 (2013.01); B65B 59/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK FR GB LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0819609 A1 19980121; EP 0819609 B1 20000119; CN 1086667 C 20020626; CN 1178753 A 19980415; DE 69701171 D1 20000224; DE 69701171 T2 20000621; DK 0819609 T3 20000501; JP H1029610 A 19980203

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2005-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-04-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20050201

2005-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-09 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040715

2005-03-07 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2005-03-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2005-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050201

2005-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050201

2004-08-16 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040816

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-08-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040802

2004-07-16 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040716

2004-07-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040715

2003-07-28 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030728

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030728

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-25 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030725

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-16 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030716

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-03 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030703

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030616

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-05-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-05-01 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69701171

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-02-24

2000-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO JEAN HUNZIKER

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB LI NL SE

1998-12-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981116

1998-09-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE DK FR GB LI NL SE

1998-09-30 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB LI NL SE

1998-08-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980618

1998-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB LI NL SE

1998-01-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI