Global Patent Index - EP 0819619 B1

EP 0819619 B1 2001-03-21 - Aerosol container discharging apparatus with stake member

Title (en)

Aerosol container discharging apparatus with stake member

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Entleeren eines Aerosolbehälters mit einem Element zum Einstecken

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour actionner un récipient aérosol avec moyens de piquetage

Publication

EP 0819619 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97304569 A

Priority

US 64839896 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0819619A1] An apparatus (10) for discharging the contents of an aerosol container (12) and for creating an opening in a substrate. The apparatus includes a rod member (14) having a front (18) and a rear end; a holder (20) for the aerosol container (12) disposed adjacent the front end of the rod member (14); an arm (23) which effects movement of the aerosol container actuator between discharging and non-discharging positions; a trigger (24) and linkage (27) system which controls the movement of the actuating arm (23); and a stake member (30) for creating an opening in a substrate, such as the ground. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 83/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/203 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0819619 A1 19980121; EP 0819619 B1 20010321; AU 2473997 A 19980129; AU 736240 B2 20010726; AU 736240 C 20020221; DE 69704311 D1 20010426; DE 69704311 T2 20010913; NO 973121 A 19980120; NO 973121 D0 19970704

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-16 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040626

2005-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050101

2004-06-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040626

2003-07-07 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030707

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030625

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030610

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-03-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69704311 20010426

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-12-27 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2000-12-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-06-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990512

1998-09-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-09-30 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 980612;LT PAYMENT 980612;LV PAYMENT 980612;RO PAYMENT 980612;SI PAYMENT 980612

1998-09-30 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-08-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980612

1998-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-01-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI