Global Patent Index - EP 0819790 B1

EP 0819790 B1 2001-12-12 - Cloth structure

Title (en)

Cloth structure

Title (de)

Gewebestruktur

Title (fr)

Structure tissée

Publication

EP 0819790 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97202155 A

Priority

NL 1003545 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0819790A1] The invention relates to a cloth structure and has for its object to provide a cloth structure which is watertight, windtight, flame-retardant, resistant to chemicals, antistatic and permeable for water vapour. In respect of the above the invention generally provides a cloth structure, comprising: a base cloth (4); at least one fire-retardant and flame-extinguishing first cover layer (6); and at least one second cover layer containing polyurethane (5), which cloth structure is watertight, resistant to chemicals, at least slightly porous and thus permeable for water vapour. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06N 7/00; B32B 27/12; D06N 3/00; D06N 3/04; D06N 3/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06N 3/00 (2006.01); D06N 3/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06N 3/0059 (2013.01); D06N 3/0063 (2013.01); D06N 3/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0819790 A1 19980121; EP 0819790 B1 20011212; AT 210754 T 20011215; DE 69708985 D1 20020124; DE 69708985 T2 20020620; DK 0819790 T3 20020325; ES 2164983 T3 20020301; NL 1003545 C2 19980112; PT 819790 E 20020531

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-07 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2004-12-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20040301

2004-11-30 [REG PT MP4A] REFUSAL OF NATIONAL PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20041011

2004-10-13 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20040301

2004-10-13 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20040301

2004-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-01-07 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040107

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-12-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20031231

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-12-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20031231

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-12-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031230

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-12-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20031230

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-12-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20031230

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-12-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20031229

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-12-24 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20031224

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-12-24 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20031224

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-12-23 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20031223

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-12-23 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20031223

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-12-23 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20031223

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-12-23 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031223

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030630

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-27 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20030627

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-27 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20030627

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-01-06 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SIOEN N.V.

2003-01-06 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: COATING APPLICATIONS GROUP LTD

2002-11-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SIOEN N.V.

- Effective date: 20020912

2002-11-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: COATING APPLICATIONS GROUP LTD

- Effective date: 20020912

2002-05-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020307

2002-05-24 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020400414

2002-05-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-25 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2164983 T3

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69708985 20020124

2002-01-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ARNOLD & SIEDSMA AG

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210754 T 20011215

1999-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990326

1998-09-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-09-30 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-09-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980716

1998-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE