Global Patent Index - EP 0819834 B1

EP 0819834 B1 2003-06-11 - Method for making a cavity in a thin-walled salt mine

Title (en)

Method for making a cavity in a thin-walled salt mine

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Bohren von einer Kaverne in einer dünnschichtigen Salzmine

Title (fr)

Procédé pour creuser une cavité dans une mine de sel de faible épaisseur

Publication

EP 0819834 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97401582 A

Priority

FR 9609104 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0819834A1] Process for hollowing out by dissolution a cavity (1a) in a terrain (1) containing a majority of salt, with the following stages: An injection channel, an extraction channel and an outline communication space are made so the injection and extraction channels are connected, and at least one outline blind tunnel is made so it extends between an open end and a closed end, with the open end opening into the communication space. A salt solvent is then injected via the injection channel into the communication space before it hollows out the cavity by dissolving the salt. The resulting brine is then removed through the extraction channel. To hollow out the cavity the blind tunnel is also hollowed out by circulating the solvent in the tunnel. Cavity formed by using this process.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 43/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 43/28 (2006.01); E21F 17/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21F 17/16 (2013.01); E21B 43/28 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0819834 A1 19980121; EP 0819834 B1 20030611; AT 242840 T 20030615; CA 2210866 A1 19980119; DE 69722718 D1 20030717; DE 69722718 T2 20040422; ES 2201252 T3 20040316; FR 2751374 A1 19980123; FR 2751374 B1 19981016; PT 819834 E 20031031

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170704

2018-05-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20180508

2017-11-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170710

2017-08-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 242840 T

- Effective date: 20170703

2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170702

2017-07-26 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170702

2017-07-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-07-05 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20170702

2017-07-03 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69722718

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160623

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20160630

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160623

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-06-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-05-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: GDF SUEZ, FR

- Document: AT 242840 T

- Effective date: 20130328

2011-12-22 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GDF SUEZ S.A., FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GAZ DE FRANCE (SERVICE NATIONAL), PARIS, FR

- Document: DE 69722718

- Effective date: 20111028

2011-12-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69722718

- Representative's name: MERTEN & KOLLEGEN, DE

- Effective date: 20111028

2011-10-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69722718

- Representative's name: MERTEN & KOLLEGEN, DE

2010-06-04 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2010-06-04 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2010-06-04 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

2010-02-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: GDF SUEZ

2009-05-29 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: GDF SUEZ SOCIETE ANONYME

- Free text: GAZ DE FRANCE (SERVICE NATIONAL)#23 RUE PHILIBERT-DELORME#F-75017 PARIS (FR) -TRANSFER TO- GDF SUEZ SOCIETE ANONYME#12-26 RUE DU DOCTEUR LANCEREAUX#75008 PARIS (FR)

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030611

2004-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040312

2004-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2201252 T3

2004-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *GAZ DE FRANCE (SERVICE NATIONAL)

- Effective date: 20030731

2004-01-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-11-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031014

2003-10-15 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030403544

2003-09-11 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030911

2003-09-11 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030911

2003-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2003-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20030729

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69722718 P 20030717

2003-07-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2003-07-03 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030703

2003-06-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-11 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030611

2003-06-11 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030611

2002-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020318

1998-09-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-09-30 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-08-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980625

1998-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE