Global Patent Index - EP 0819839 B1

EP 0819839 B1 2002-09-25 - Internal combustion engine with an acoustic insulating cover and a cooling air fan

Title (en)

Internal combustion engine with an acoustic insulating cover and a cooling air fan

Title (de)

Schalldämmende Abdeckung für eine Brennkraftmaschine mit Kühlluftgebläse

Title (fr)

Couvercle insonorisant pour moteur à combustion avec un ventilateur pour le refroidissement

Publication

EP 0819839 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97111218 A

Priority

DE 19629307 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0819839A1] A bulkhead wall extends from the flat part of the cover, extending in the direction of the cylinder head, and forming a defining wall for the cooling air feed. The cylinder head hood (3), in the area of the injection nozzles (6), has an inwardly drawn section supporting on the cylinder head (5) with through passages for the injection nozzles. The inwardly drawn section, in common with the flat cover part and the exhaust gas-side bulkhead wall (10) reaching to the cylinder head hood, together with a parallel suction pipe-side limiting wall (15) extending from the flat part to the hood, forms a channel-shaped, elongated nozzle chamber (9).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02B 77/13; F02F 1/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02B 77/13 (2006.01); F02F 1/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02F 7/006 (2013.01); F02B 77/13 (2013.01); F02F 1/34 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0819839 A1 19980121; EP 0819839 B1 20020925; DE 19629307 A1 19980122

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070703

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080722

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2007-05-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070330

2007-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060703

2006-07-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-07-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060703

2005-07-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050712

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-06-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050621

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-04-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708306 20021031

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-10-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000831

1999-04-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

1998-09-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

1998-09-30 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-01-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971031

1998-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT