Global Patent Index - EP 0820042 A3

EP 0820042 A3 2000-03-29 - Automatic transaction apparatus

Title (en)

Automatic transaction apparatus

Title (de)

Transaktionsapparat

Title (fr)

Machine bancaire

Publication

EP 0820042 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 97111935 A

Priority

JP 19098996 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0820042A2] An automatic transaction apparatus comprises a media operation unit having a card access port and paper currency depositing/receiving port and a housing unit which includes a card process portion and a plurality of paper currency dispenser portions which are positioned at the side of the card access port and the paper currency depositing/receiving port. Also included are a slider portion which is arranged to be movable in a given direction behind the card access port and the paper currency depositing/receiving port and in front of the card process portion and the plurality of paper currency dispenser portions. Further included are a transport unit which is supported by the slider portion, and which has a chuck portion which is movable between the operation unit and the housing unit. A controller also forms part of the apparatus; the controller controls movement of the slider portion and the chuck portion. The media operation unit is designed so that it moves to a position corresponding to the card insertion portion or paper currency depositing/receiving portion on the media operation unit to receive different media such as a card or paper currency from the chuck portion. The slider portion is designed so that it moves to the position corresponding to the card process portion or the plurality of paper currency dispenser portions of the housing unit to deliver the different media thereto. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07D 11/00; G07F 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07D 9/00 (2006.01); G07D 11/00 (2006.01); G07F 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 19/20 (2013.01); G07D 11/0018 (2013.01); G07D 11/0081 (2013.01); G07F 19/201 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0820042 A2 19980121; EP 0820042 A3 20000329; EP 0820042 B1 20030402; DE 69720333 D1 20030508; JP 3318206 B2 20020826; JP H1040443 A 19980213; US 6036089 A 20000314

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040105

2004-03-03 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030714

2004-02-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-07-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030714

2003-07-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030703

2003-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69720333 P 20030508

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-04-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-04-02 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030402

2002-01-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011122

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000616

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-01-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI