Global Patent Index - EP 0820311 A4

EP 0820311 A4 2002-09-25 - TRANSPLANTATION OF GENETICALLY MODIFIED CELLS HAVING LOW LEVELS OF CLASS I MHC PROTEINS ON THE CELL SURFACE

Title (en)

TRANSPLANTATION OF GENETICALLY MODIFIED CELLS HAVING LOW LEVELS OF CLASS I MHC PROTEINS ON THE CELL SURFACE

Title (de)

TRANSPLANTATION VON GENETISCH VERÄNDERTEN ZELLEN MIT EINEM NIEDRIGEN GEHALT VON KLASSE I MHC PROTEINEN AUF IHRER ZELLOBERFLÄCHE

Title (fr)

TRANSPLANTATION DE CELLULES GENETIQUEMENT MODIFIEES PRESENTANT DE FAIBLES TAUX DE PROTEINES DE CLASSE I DU COMPLEXE MAJEUR D'HISTOCOMPATIBILITE SUR LEUR SURFACE

Publication

EP 0820311 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96912564 A

Priority

  • US 9604648 W
  • US 41610695 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9631241A1] Mammalian cells are genetically modified by the introduction of genes encoding virus-derived MHC down-regulatory proteins. Suitable cells for transplantation are taken from a donor, and transfected with an expression vector encoding one or more virus-derived MHC down-regulatory proteins. The genetically modified donor cells are expanded ex vivo, if appropriate, and transplanted into a recipient mammalian host. The decreased levels of class I MHC protein allow the transplanted cells to survive under conditions where the genetically unmodified cells would be otherwise subject to attack by the recipient immune system. The donor cells may be additionally modified to target cells or to enhance effector function of the donor cells in the mammalian host.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 48/00; C12N 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 35/14 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/16 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/21 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/035 (2006.01); C07K 14/045 (2006.01); C07K 14/075 (2006.01); C12N 5/0789 (2010.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/86 (2006.01); A61K 35/12 (2015.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/86 (2013.01); A61K 39/001 (2013.01); C07K 14/005 (2013.01); C12N 5/0647 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01); A61K 2035/122 (2013.01); C12N 2710/10322 (2013.01); C12N 2710/16122 (2013.01); C12N 2710/16622 (2013.01); C12N 2740/13043 (2013.01); C12N 2840/203 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] HORWITZ MARSHALL S ET AL: "Multiple functions of adenovirus E3 immunoregulatory genes: Effects on acute viral pathogenesis and prolongation of survival of pancreatic islet allografts.", JOURNAL OF CELLULAR BIOCHEMISTRY SUPPLEMENT, no. 19A, 1995, Keystone Symposium on Molecular Aspects of Viral Immunity;Keystone, Colorado, USA; January 16-23, 1995, pages 279, XP002187508, ISSN: 0733-1959
  • [A] RAWLE F C ET AL: "MOUSE ANTI-ADENOVIRUS CYTOTOXIC T LYMPHOCYTES INHIBITION OF LYSIS BY E3 GP19K BUT NOT E3 14.7K", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, vol. 143, no. 6, 1989, pages 2031 - 2037, XP002187509, ISSN: 0022-1767
  • [PX] EFRAT SHIMON ET AL: "Prolonged survival of pancreatic islet allografts mediated by adenovirus immunoregulatory transgenes.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES, vol. 92, no. 15, July 1995 (1995-07-01), 1995, pages 6947 - 6951, XP002187510, ISSN: 0027-8424
  • [A] SESTER MARTINA ET AL: "Conserved cysteine residues within the E3/19K protein of adenovirus type 2 are essential for binding to major histocompatibility complex antigens.", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, vol. 68, no. 9, 1994, pages 5423 - 5432, XP002187511, ISSN: 0022-538X
  • See also references of WO 9631241A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9631241 A1 19961010; AU 5533896 A 19961023; AU 712415 B2 19991104; CA 2217297 A1 19961010; EP 0820311 A1 19980128; EP 0820311 A4 20020925; JP H11503024 A 19990323; NO 974596 A 19971203; NO 974596 D0 19971003

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-28 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030301

2002-09-25 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020701

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 48/00 A, 7C 12N 5/10 B

1998-01-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971031

1998-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE