Global Patent Index - EP 0820330 B1

EP 0820330 B1 2000-09-13 - BOAT FOR DIVERS

Title (en)

BOAT FOR DIVERS

Title (de)

TAUCHERSCHLITTEN

Title (fr)

EMBARCATION POUR PLONGEURS

Publication

EP 0820330 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96907996 A

Priority

  • DE 9600568 W
  • DE 19511850 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19511850A1] The proposal is for a boat for divers in the hull (1) of which there is a flow channel (5) with a propulsion screw (15) with, in the hull (1) above said flow channel (5), an electric motor (11) and other control devices, the bow of which has a hydrodynamic configuration (4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63B 35/12; B63C 11/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63B 35/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63B 35/12 (2013.01); B63C 11/46 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19511850 A1 19961002; AU 5141696 A 19961016; BR 9607873 A 19991130; DE 19680199 D2 19980423; EP 0820330 A1 19980128; EP 0820330 B1 20000913; US 5878687 A 19990309; WO 9630087 A1 19961003

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-01 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59605884

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2016-01-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59605884

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: HERRMANN, JOCHEN, DIPL.-ING., DE

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150421

- Year of fee payment: 20

2001-09-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-02-09 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-12-15 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001215

2000-10-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59605884

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-10-19

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GR IT

2000-09-13 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000913

2000-09-13 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000913

2000-09-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000913

1999-02-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981222

1998-01-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971024

1998-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GR IT