Global Patent Index - EP 0820467 A4

EP 0820467 A4 2001-12-05 - METHODS OF TREATING DISORDERS OF THE EYE

Title (en)

METHODS OF TREATING DISORDERS OF THE EYE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON AUGENKRANKHEITEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDES DE TRAITEMENT DE TROUBLES OCULAIRES

Publication

EP 0820467 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96910617 A

Priority

  • US 9604240 W
  • US 41129595 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9630403A1] The present invention relates to methods for the prophylaxis or treatment of retinal cells by the administration of a therapeutically effective amount of a neuregulin polypeptide.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 14/00; A61K 38/00; A61K 48/00; C07H 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 31/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/22 (2006.01); A61P 27/00 (2006.01); A61P 27/02 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 14/475 (2006.01); C12N 5/0793 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 5/062 (2013.01); C07K 14/4756 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); C12N 2501/60 (2013.01); Y10S 514/912 (2013.01); Y10S 514/913 (2013.01); Y10S 514/914 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9630403 A1 19961003; AU 5376696 A 19961016; AU 713384 B2 19991202; CA 2215330 A1 19961003; EP 0820467 A1 19980128; EP 0820467 A4 20011205; JP H11509831 A 19990831; US 6750196 B1 20040615

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-05 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051110

2003-07-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030613

2003-03-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CENES PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

2003-03-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: UNIVERSITY OF WASHINGTON

2003-01-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CENES PHARMACEUTICALS INC.

2003-01-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: UNIVERSITY OF WASHINGTON

2001-12-05 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20011019

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-01-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971023

1998-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE