Global Patent Index - EP 0820529 B1

EP 0820529 B1 2000-08-02 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURING HOT-WORKED ELONGATED PRODUCTS, IN PARTICULAR BAR OR PIPE, FROM HIGH-ALLOY OR HYPEREUTECTOID STEEL

Title (en)

METHOD OF MANUFACTURING HOT-WORKED ELONGATED PRODUCTS, IN PARTICULAR BAR OR PIPE, FROM HIGH-ALLOY OR HYPEREUTECTOID STEEL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES WARMGEFERTIGTEN LANGGESTRECKTEN ERZEUGNISSES INSBESONDERE STAB ODER ROHR AUS HOCHLEGIERTEM ODER ÜBEREUTEKTOIDEM STAHL

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE PRODUITS ALLONGES FINIS A CHAUD, NOTAMMENT DU TYPE BARRE OU TUBE, EN ACIER FORTEMENT ALLIE OU HYPEREUTECTOIDE

Publication

EP 0820529 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96907260 A

Priority

  • DE 9600501 W
  • DE 19513314 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19513314A1] In the method proposed, the length of the selected case-hardening material is heated to the working temperature and, after one or two working stages, is reheated to a temperature below the original working temperature and continuously rolled to its final dimensions in a multi-stand reducing mill and then cooled in still air. The invention is characterized in that, following the initial working stages but before reheating, a uniform temperature distribution is produced over the whole length and thickness of the partly finished product by controlled heating or cooling to a given temperature lying within a particular temperature range.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21D 8/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 3/00 (2006.01); C21D 8/06 (2006.01); C21D 8/10 (2006.01); C22C 38/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/18 (2006.01); C21D 6/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21D 1/32 (2013.01); C21D 8/065 (2013.01); C21D 8/10 (2013.01); C21D 6/002 (2013.01); C21D 2211/003 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19513314 A1 19961010; DE 19513314 C2 19970703; AR 001416 A1 19971022; BR 9604830 A 19990105; CA 2217309 A1 19961010; CA 2217309 C 20001121; CZ 9703047 A3 19980415; EP 0820529 A1 19980128; EP 0820529 B1 20000802; ES 2149455 T3 20001101; HU 9800702 A2 19980728; HU 9800702 A3 19990830; JP H11503491 A 19990326; PL 322598 A1 19980202; SK 134297 A3 19980408; US 5958158 A 19990928; WO 9631628 A1 19961010

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2016-03-12 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59605681

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150320

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-03-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2005-03-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050312

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20020411

2001-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-13 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010313

2000-11-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2149455 T3

2000-09-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605681 20000907

2000-08-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: GUZZI E RAVIZZA S.R.L.

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT SE

2000-01-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991214

1998-01-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970918

1998-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT SE