Global patent index - EP 0820554 B1

EP 0820554 B1 2000-01-12 - CLOSURE SECURITY SYSTEM

Title (en)

CLOSURE SECURITY SYSTEM

Title (de)

SICHERHEITSVERRIEGELUNGSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE SECURITE POUR DISPOSITIF DE FERMETURE

Publication

EP 0820554 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96909257 A

Priority

  • GB 9600850 W
  • GB 9507388 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9632557A1] A security system for a closure such as a door, for example a garage door (2), comprises lock means (4) mounted on the closure (2) and operable from outside the closure (2), a shaft (14) extending through the closure (2) perpendicular thereto to terminate internally of the closure (2) and rotatable on release of the lock means (4), a locking arm (16) mounted on the shaft (14) internally of the closure (2) and rotatable with the shaft (14), and locating means (40) fixedly mounted relative to and internally of the closure (2), preferably on the floor, the arrangement being such that rotation of the shaft (14) results in rotation of the locking arm (16) in a plane parallel with the closure (2) about an axis extending perpendicular to the closure (2) from an inoperative position displaced from the locating means (40) into an operative position co-operating with the locating means (40), the locking means (4) being operable to retain the locking arm (16) in its operative position to prevent opening of the closure (2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 17/44 (2006.01); E05B 65/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 17/443 (2013.01); E05B 65/0021 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9632557 A1 19961017; AU 5282496 A 19961030; CA 2217365 A1 19961017; DE 69606172 D1 20000217; EP 0820554 A1 19980128; EP 0820554 B1 20000112; GB 9507388 D0 19950531; GB 9518136 D0 19951108

INPADOC legal status

2000-12-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-06-09 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-06-05 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT; NO LEGAL EFFECT FROM

2000-04-13 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000413

2000-04-12 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-04-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69606172

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000217

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB IT NL

2000-01-12 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-12 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-12 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000112

1999-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990226

1998-01-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971030

1998-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB IT NL