Global Patent Index - EP 0820603 B1

EP 0820603 B1 2000-04-26 - AN APPARATUS FOR WRAPPING FIBRE OPTIC CABLE AROUND AND OVERHEAD LINE

Title (en)

AN APPARATUS FOR WRAPPING FIBRE OPTIC CABLE AROUND AND OVERHEAD LINE

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM UMWICKELN EINER ÜBERLANDLEITUNGSLINIE MIT EINEM FASEROPTISCHEN KABEL

Title (fr)

APPAREIL SERVANT A ENROULER UN CABLE OPTIQUE AUTOUR D'UNE LIGNE AERIENNE

Publication

EP 0820603 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96909219 A

Priority

  • GB 9600753 W
  • GB 9507492 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9632661A1] The present invention relates to an apparatus for wrapping fibre optic cable around an overhead line, comprising a carriage (1) which sits on the overhead line (A) and is moveable along the overhead line (A), a supply of fibre optic cable (B) located on one side of the carriage (1) and a counterbalance (3) for the cable supply located on the other side of the carriage (1). Gear means (4) are arranged to cause rotation of the carriage (1) around the overhead line (A) when the carriage (1) moves along the overhead line (A) thereby wrapping the fibre optic cable (B) around the overhead line (1). Tensioning means (5, 6, 7, 8, 9, 10, 11) are provided which apply a substantially constant tension to the fibre optic cable (B) during all modes of operation of the apparatus.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G02B 6/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02B 6/44 (2006.01); G02B 6/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G02B 6/486 (2013.01); G02B 6/4422 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

International Conference on Large High Voltage Electric System, 1988 Session - 28th August - 3rd September, CIGRE', Paris - 22-08, pages 1-6

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR IE IT LI PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9632661 A1 19961017; AT 192243 T 20000515; AU 5279596 A 19961030; AU 697254 B2 19981001; CA 2219897 A1 19961017; CA 2219897 C 20060606; DE 69607954 D1 20000531; DE 69607954 T2 20001005; EP 0820603 A1 19980128; EP 0820603 B1 20000426; ES 2146395 T3 20000801; GB 9507492 D0 19950531; PT 820603 E 20000831; US 6032448 A 20000307; ZA 9602852 B 19971010

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160405

2016-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160330

2016-07-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160329

2016-07-06 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160706

2016-05-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 192243 T

- Effective date: 20160329

2016-05-04 [REG IE MK9A] PATENT EXPIRED

2016-05-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2016-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-04-05 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: MAXIMUM VALIDITY LIMIT REACHED

- Effective date: 20160329

2016-03-29 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69607954

2015-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150327

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150317

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150327

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150304

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150326

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150327

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150327

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150324

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20150309

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20150327

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-03-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2007-10-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: AFL TELECOMMUNICATIONS EUROPE LIMITED

- Free text: AFL TELECOMMUNICATIONS EUROPE LIMITED#HAWKSWORTH INDUSTRIAL ESTATE, NEWCOMBE DRIVE HAWKSWORTH#SWINDON, WILTSHIRE SM2 1DZ (GB) -TRANSFER TO- AFL TELECOMMUNICATIONS EUROPE LIMITED#HAWKSWORTH INDUSTRIAL ESTATE, NEWCOMBE DRIVE HAWKSWORTH#SWINDON, WILTSHIRE SM2 1DZ (GB)

2002-09-30 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: *ALF TELECOMMUNICATIONS EUROPE LTDHAWKSWORTH INDUS

2002-08-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Free text: FOCAS LIMITED,NEWCOMBE DRIVE, HAWKSWORTH,SWINDON, WILTSHIRE, SN2 1DZ (GB) TRANSFER- FOCAS LIMITED,THE ADELPHI, 1-11 JOHN ADAM STREET,,LONDON WC2N 6HJ (GB)

2002-08-30 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: FOCAS LIMITED TRANSFER- AFL TELECOMMUNICATIONS EUR

2001-09-07 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2001-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000509

2000-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2146395 T3

2000-06-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-31 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2000-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69607954 20000531

2000-04-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR IE IT LI PT SE

2000-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 192243 T 20000515

2000-04-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

1999-12-08 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR IE IT LI PT SE

1998-08-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980710

1998-01-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971023

1998-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR IE IT LI PT SE