Global patent index - EP 0820669 A4

EP 0820669 A4 2001-04-25 - DATA NETWORK SWITCH WITH FAULT TOLERANCE

Title (en)

DATA NETWORK SWITCH WITH FAULT TOLERANCE

Title (de)

DATENNETZVERMITTLER MIT FEHLERTOLERANZ

Title (fr)

COMMUTATEUR DE RESEAU DE DONNEES AVEC TOLERANCE AUX ANOMALIES

Publication

EP 0820669 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96911721 A

Priority

  • GB 9507454 A
  • US 9605029 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2299914A] An ATM data network switch having a plurality of slot controllers 11a-11f, each slot controller having at least one external data link 12/13 and being separately connected to two separate switch fabrics 14a,14b, each switch fabric comprising means for switching a data cell transmitted from any one of the slot controllers to any of the other slot controllers, characterised in that both of the switch fabrics are active at the same time and each slot controller comprises means for determining the availability of the data paths to all the other slot controllers through both switch fabrics and for selecting for each cell to be switched a data path through one or other of the switch fabrics according to the availability determined.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04L 12/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04L 1/22 (2006.01); H04L 12/933 (2013.01); H04L 12/939 (2013.01); H04L 12/70 (2013.01); H04L 12/931 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 49/105 (2013.01); H04L 1/22 (2013.01); H04L 49/557 (2013.01); H04L 49/205 (2013.01); H04L 2012/5627 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] PATTAVINA A: "BROADBAND SWITCHING SYSTEMS: FIRST GENERATION", EUROPEAN TRANSACTIONS ON TELECOMMUNICATIONS AND RELATED TECHNOLOGIES,IT,AEI, MILANO, vol. 2, no. 1, 1991, pages 75 - 87, XP000225471, ISSN: 1120-3862
  • [A] FISCHER W ET AL: "A SCALABLE ATM SWITCHING SYSTEM ARCHITECTURE", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, vol. 9, no. 8, 1 October 1991 (1991-10-01), pages 1299 - 1307, XP000267581, ISSN: 0733-8716
  • See also references of WO 9632790A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

GB 2299914 A 19961016; GB 2299914 B 20000322; GB 9607539 D0 19960612; CA 2213276 A1 19961017; EP 0820669 A1 19980128; EP 0820669 A4 20010425; GB 9507454 D0 19950531; WO 9632790 A1 19961017

INPADOC legal status

2003-05-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20011207

2001-04-25 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20010309

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-04-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 04L 12/56 A

1998-01-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971111

1998-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB