Global Patent Index - EP 0820712 B1

EP 0820712 B1 2001-05-30 - Guiding device for a drawer with double extensible guide

Title (en)

Guiding device for a drawer with double extensible guide

Title (de)

Vollauszugsführung für Schubladen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de guidage de tiroir à glissière double

Publication

EP 0820712 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97112798 A

Priority

CH 186896 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0820712A2] The drawer rail (3) is fixed on both sides to the drawer (22) and the body rail (1) is fitted on two opposite inner walls (11) of a furniture body accommodating the drawer. A middle rail (2) is fitted between the drawer and body rails. The body rail is U-shaped, whereby one arm is formed as installation edge for fixture to the body inner surface and is connected with the second rail of the U-shape, which is formed as a vertical bearing wall, by a horizontal running surface (14). The bearing wall on its outside turned away from the body inner wall has two rollers (8) and on its upper end has a further horizontal running surface (15), which has a vertically downwardly facing edge.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 88/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 88/493 (2017.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 88/493 (2017.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0820712 A2 19980128; EP 0820712 A3 19990407; EP 0820712 B1 20010530; AT 201575 T 20010615; AT 5334 U1 20020625; CH 690813 A5 20010131; DE 59703648 D1 20010705; ES 2157502 T3 20010816

INPADOC legal status


2012-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100726

2011-11-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20111118

2011-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100725

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100725

2011-05-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59703648

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090728

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090925

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090714

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090714

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2157502 T3

2001-07-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703648 20010705

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES IT

2001-05-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201575 T 20010615

2000-05-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000406

2000-02-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: JULIUS BLUM GESELLSCHAFT M.B.H.

2000-02-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BALIKO, KARL

1999-12-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES IT

1999-12-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991006

1999-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-04-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

1998-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES IT

1998-01-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI