Global Patent Index - EP 0820752 B1

EP 0820752 B1 2002-09-25 - Fixation device for the supply tube of a dental handpiece

Title (en)

Fixation device for the supply tube of a dental handpiece

Title (de)

Haltevorrichtung für den Versorgungsschlauch eines zahnärztlichen Handstückes

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fixation pour tube d'alimentation d'une pièce à main dentaire

Publication

EP 0820752 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97111851 A

Priority

DE 19630349 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19630349C1] The retention device has a pivot arm (5), secured to a carrier to extend forwards at an angle, facing away from the dental instrument operating point, in the normal position and pivoted to face in the direction of the operating point in the operating position. The supply hose is secured to the carrier arm via a number of integral retaining hoops (7,8) spaced along the length of the carrier arm with one of the straps at the free end of the carrier arm. The width of the carrier arm tapers towards its free end.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61G 15/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61C 1/08 (2006.01); A61G 15/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 15/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FI FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19630349 C1 19971120; DK 0820752 T3 20021209; EP 0820752 A2 19980128; EP 0820752 A3 19980527; EP 0820752 B1 20020925; JP H1066715 A 19980310

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050711

2005-04-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-07 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2005-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050201

2004-08-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040802

2004-07-11 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040711

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-08-04 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030804

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-23 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030723

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-17 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20030717

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-16 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20030716

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-01-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-09 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708308 20021031

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FI FR IT

2001-12-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011019

1999-06-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIRONA DENTAL SYSTEMS GMBH

1999-02-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE DK FI FR IT

1999-02-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE DK FI FR IT

1998-11-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980916

1998-05-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-05-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIRONA DENTAL SYSTEMS GMBH & CO.KG

1998-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE DK FI FR IT