Global Patent Index - EP 0820836 B1

EP 0820836 B1 2001-02-28 - Method and apparatus for sharpening cutters for a crusher, in particular for wood

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for sharpening cutters for a crusher, in particular for wood

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Nachschärfen von Messern für Zerkleinerungsmaschinen, insbesondere von Zerspanmessern für Holz

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour dresser les couteaux d'un broyeur, notamment pour bois

Publication

EP 0820836 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97111691 A

Priority

DE 19629668 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2211242A1] The invention is based on the method for the resharpening of knives used in size-reduction machines described in the US Patent 5,525,094 in which the knives remain installed in a rotatable knife carrier. With this invention the process has been further developed in so far as the cutting edges S are ground one after another respectively at one stop position of the knife carrier 8 in which the radial ray MS of the cutting circle with the direction mS of the grinding feed v at the knife cutting edges S encloses the clearance angle ~. So the invention offers the possibility to chose for the cutting edges any clearance angle matching the properties of the material to be flaked. The indicated reference numbers refer to Fig. 4 of the application drawings.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 3/36; B26D 7/12; B27L 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 3/36 (2006.01); B26D 7/12 (2006.01); B27L 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27L 11/00 (2013.01); B24B 3/363 (2013.01); B26D 7/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19629668 C1 19980102; CA 2211242 A1 19980123; CA 2211242 C 20061010; EP 0820836 A1 19980128; EP 0820836 B1 20010228; US 5868602 A 19990209

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130710

2014-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130710

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120723

- Year of fee payment: 16

2002-02-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-05-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010418

2001-04-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE ES FR GB IT

2001-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20010228

2000-02-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990311

1999-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990311

1998-11-12 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

1998-10-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE ES FR GB IT

1998-04-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980211

1998-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE