Global Patent Index - EP 0820838 B1

EP 0820838 B1 2000-08-16 - Sander with eccentrically driven tool

Title (en)

Sander with eccentrically driven tool

Title (de)

Schleifer mit einem mit Exzenterhub angetriebenen Werkzeug

Title (fr)

Ponçeuse à plateau excentrique

Publication

EP 0820838 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97112604 A

Priority

DE 19629989 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0820838A1] A fan wheel (4) is arranged coaxially with the driver. It is also one of the eccentric members and has an eccentric bore (5), in which an eccentric socket (6) as second eccentric member concentrically locates with its outer periphery. The eccentric socket is rotatable relatively to the fan wheel and is fixable to it, having an eccentric bore (7) in which the driver (10) arranged on the tool (11) is located. The eccentric bore opens to the face side of the fan wheel and in it the eccentric socket is arranged. The driver of the grinding tool has a pin (10a) engaging in the eccentric bore (7) of the eccentric socket (6) via a bearing (8).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 23/03; B24B 23/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 23/03 (2006.01); B24B 23/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 23/03 (2013.01); B24B 23/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0820838 A1 19980128; EP 0820838 B1 20000816; DE 19629989 A1 19980205; DE 19629989 C2 19990128

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150731

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160202

2016-04-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160331

2016-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59702189

2015-07-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59702189

- Representative's name: LORENZ & KOLLEGEN PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140724

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140724

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130723

2014-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130723

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120723

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100723

2011-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090727

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-11-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090727

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-07-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP;ZWAENGIWEG 7;8038 ZUERICH (CH)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-15 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. ZINI MARANESI & C. S.R.L.

2000-11-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-09-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000906

2000-09-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702189 20000921

2000-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-08-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990315

1998-10-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1998-03-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980126

1998-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE