Global Patent Index - EP 0821110 B1

EP 0821110 B1 2002-11-13 - Kitchen sink

Title (en)

Kitchen sink

Title (de)

Küchenspüle

Title (fr)

Evier de cuisine

Publication

EP 0821110 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97111736 A

Priority

DE 19629840 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0821110A2] The frame (9) and the basin (4,5) are pressed against one another along all-round, overlapping connecting surfaces (4b,5b,4c,5c). The press fitting is formed by an under-dimension on the connecting surfaces (9a,11) of the frame in relation to the corresponding connecting surfaces of the basin or by an excess-dimension on the connecting surfaces of the basin in relation to the corresponding connecting surfaces of the frame. Several spaced apart or differently directed connecting surfaces are provided with press fitting between the frame and basin. At least one press fitting is combined with back-cut zones in the connecting area of the frame or the basin.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03C 1/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0821110 A2 19980128; EP 0821110 A3 19980610; EP 0821110 B1 20021113; DE 19629840 A1 19980129; DK 0821110 T3 20030224; ES 2184935 T3 20030416; NO 312328 B1 20020429; NO 973388 A 19980126; NO 973388 D0 19970722; PL 183984 B1 20020830; PL 321288 A1 19980202; US 5870783 A 19990216

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59708697

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140731

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140710

2015-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140731

2015-02-27 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-02-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59708697

2014-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130711

2014-09-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140908

2014-05-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140204

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130710

2014-04-04 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20030400372

- Effective date: 20140204

2014-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130710

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130730

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130723

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130724

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120723

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-11-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20120731

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120723

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-04-12 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: FRANKE TECHNOLOGY AND TRADEMARK LTD., CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: NIRO-PLAN AG, ZUG, CH

- Document: DE 59708697

- Effective date: 20120216

2012-04-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59708697

- Representative's name: LEMCKE, BROMMER & PARTNER, PATENTANWAELTE PART, DE

- Effective date: 20120216

2009-06-30 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20090330

2009-05-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090201

2009-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090201

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070717

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-05-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070330

2006-07-10 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060710

2005-07-21 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20050721

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-07-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050719

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-03-07 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2005-03-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2004-08-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040802

2004-07-11 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040711

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-07-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20030729

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030728

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-05-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2184935 T3

2003-02-27 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030400372

2003-02-24 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708697 20021219

2002-12-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19981015

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010612

1999-02-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

1999-02-24 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 981015

1999-02-24 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

1998-12-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981015

1998-06-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL SE