Global Patent Index - EP 0821111 B1

EP 0821111 B1 2000-09-13 - Prefabricated concrete manhole element with a plastic liner

Title (en)

Prefabricated concrete manhole element with a plastic liner

Title (de)

Betonfertigteil-Schacht mit einer Kunststoff-Auskleidung

Title (fr)

Regard de chaussée préfabriquée en béton avec un revêtement en plastique

Publication

EP 0821111 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97112581 A

Priority

  • DE 29612834 U
  • DE 29704338 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0821111A2] The ready-made concrete shaft has a double-walled sealed pipe (4) in at least one wall opening. The pipe has a concrete outer and a plastics inner liner, the end of which is held inside the shaft opening. The inner liner is exposed over a sealing section and the concrete outer pipe projects into the shaft wall opening by a shorter distance than the exposed section. This opening has a plastics sleeve which converges from the outside to the shaft inside in at least three steps, forming a compatible socket with a shoulder for the pipe end. At least one sealing ring fits between the sleeve and the pipe. The shaft has a plastics inner liner (2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03F 5/02; E02D 29/12; E03F 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02D 29/12 (2006.01); E03F 3/04 (2006.01); E03F 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02D 29/12 (2013.01); E02D 29/124 (2013.01); E02D 29/125 (2013.01); E02D 29/149 (2013.01); E03F 5/02 (2013.01); E03F 5/021 (2013.01); E03F 5/025 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0821111 A2 19980128; EP 0821111 A3 19980708; EP 0821111 B1 20000913; AT 196337 T 20000915; CZ 293312 B6 20040317; CZ 9702352 A3 19980218

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120723

2013-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-05-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59702340

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-04-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130329

2013-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 196337 T

- Effective date: 20120723

2013-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: KUNSTSTOFFROHREN *SENDENHORST G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20120731

2011-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20110811

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110731

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110810

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110810

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110810

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: 1A ABATRON PATENTBUERO

2009-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ABATRON-PATENTBUERO AG

2009-07-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: FUNKE KUNSTSTOFFE GMBH

- Free text: KUNSTSTOFFROEHREN SENDENHORST GMBH#OSTTOR 84-88#48324 SENDENHORST (DE) -TRANSFER TO- FUNKE KUNSTSTOFFE GMBH#SIEGENBECKSTRASSE 15#59071 HAMM-UENTROP (DE)

2001-09-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATMED AG

2000-10-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702340 20001019

2000-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR LI

2000-09-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 196337 T 20000915

1999-12-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991018

1999-03-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE FR LI

1999-03-24 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR LI

1998-10-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980817

1998-07-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR LI