Global Patent Index - EP 0821141 B1

EP 0821141 B1 2001-05-30 - Internal combustion engine valve drive with rocker arm supported by eccentric shaft

Title (en)

Internal combustion engine valve drive with rocker arm supported by eccentric shaft

Title (de)

Ventiltrieb einer Brennkraftmaschine mit sich an einer Exzenterwelle abstützenden Schwinghebeln

Title (fr)

Commande de soupape pour moteur à combustion interne comprenant un levier en appui sur arbre à excentriques

Publication

EP 0821141 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97110694 A

Priority

DE 19629881 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0821141A1] The mechanism is supported on an eccentric shaft (11) which is driven by cams and is formed as pivot levers acting as transmission members. The valve lift is variable through twisting of the eccentric shaft which is provided with a positioning motor. A force accumulator component which is formed as a spring part (10) engages on the shaft, supporting the motor by a desired twisting of the shaft in the direction of a larger valve lift. The force accumulator component tries to move the eccentric shaft without the effect of the positioning motor into such a position, thus producing a larger valve lift than the minimal possible. The spring part may be formed as a twisted rotary rod sprung held inside the hollow eccentric shaft.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 13/0063 (2013.01); F01L 13/0026 (2013.01); F01L 2001/0475 (2013.01); F01L 2820/032 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0821141 A1 19980128; EP 0821141 B1 20010530; DE 19629881 A1 19980129

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-01 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050701

2005-04-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-02-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040701

2004-07-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040701

2004-02-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040203

2003-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030730

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030626

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020829

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2001-07-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703649 20010705

2001-06-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-07-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000607

1998-10-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-01-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971120

1998-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE