Global Patent Index - EP 0821157 B1

EP 0821157 B1 2001-12-19 - Fastening device of an injection nozzle

Title (en)

Fastening device of an injection nozzle

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Befestigung eines Einspritzdüsenhalters

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fixation d'un injecteur

Publication

EP 0821157 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97109640 A

Priority

DE 19629855 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0821157A1] The tension paw on the one hand at its free end supports on a support surface on the cylinder head and on the other hand at its fork-shaped end it supports on locating surfaces on the injection nozzle holder, thereby pressing the holder on to a seat in the accommodation hole. The injection nozzle holder (1) has a stop surface (10) as dismantling aid and with the holder installed the lateral projection of the fixture screw (11), viewed longitudinally, is spaced from the stop surface. On loosening the fixture screw its lateral projection locates on the stop surface and with further loosening of the screw the injection nozzle holder is activated.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 61/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02F 7/00 (2006.01); F02M 61/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/14 (2013.01); F02F 7/006 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19629855 C1 19971211; EP 0821157 A1 19980128; EP 0821157 B1 20011219; US 5794595 A 19980818

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140613

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140613

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-03-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150227

2015-03-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59705851

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140613

2015-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59705851

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130701

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130719

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130902

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130626

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-09-26 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2008-09-26 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020315

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705851 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010321

1999-04-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

1998-10-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-01-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971024

1998-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT