Global Patent Index - EP 0821164 A3

EP 0821164 A3 2000-09-13 - Method for switching on or off systems or machines in a fluid power system

Title (en)

Method for switching on or off systems or machines in a fluid power system

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Schaltung von Einrichtungen oder Maschinen in einem Strömungssystem

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la commutation d'appareils ou de machines dans un système fluidique

Publication

EP 0821164 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97110972 A

Priority

DE 19630264 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0821164A2] The switching method provides switching signals for the electric pump (1) in response to flow variations in a bypass line (5) for the main flow pipe, detected via a measuring device (11). The latter may provide the flow direction and flow quantity, which are evaluated for providing the pump switching signals, with a pressure switch (12) detecting leakages below the response level of the measuring device, for switching in the pump.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 49/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 49/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 49/02 (2013.01); F04B 2207/0411 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0821164 A2 19980128; EP 0821164 A3 20000913; DE 19630264 A1 19980129

INPADOC legal status


2003-02-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020801

2002-05-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020321

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR GB IT

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010302

2000-09-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 04B 49/02 A, 7F 04D 15/02 B

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT