Global Patent Index - EP 0821199 B1

EP 0821199 B1 2000-11-15 - Positive safety device for the gas supply in a burner

Title (en)

Positive safety device for the gas supply in a burner

Title (de)

Positive Sicherheitsvorrichtung der Gaszufuhr in einem Brenner

Title (fr)

Dispositif de sécurisation positive d'admission de gaz dans un brûleur

Publication

EP 0821199 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97401758 A

Priority

FR 9609372 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0821199A1] The burner admission valve (25) is initially opened by a boost-type control circuit (27), having 1W output, via a self-resetting bi-metal (SRC), guarding against flue obstruction. A second boost circuit (24), with 30 mW output, keeps the valve open. Both circuits give higher output voltages than the battery which provides power supplies, and the latter is insufficient to operate the valve. The burner is lit by a spark generator (20), based on an oscillator (21) and a discharge circuit (22) giving a 15 kV output for 5 microseconds; this is associated with a flame detector (11) using the diode effect of ionisation. These devices are directed at an igniter gas nozzle near the burner. The equipment is further described in European Patent 0 821 198 (q.v.).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23N 5/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23N 5/24 (2006.01); F23N 1/08 (2006.01); F23N 5/12 (2006.01); F23N 5/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23N 5/245 (2013.01); F23N 1/08 (2013.01); F23N 5/12 (2013.01); F23N 5/20 (2013.01); F23N 2027/36 (2013.01); F23N 2035/14 (2013.01); F23N 2035/16 (2013.01); F23N 2035/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0821199 A1 19980128; EP 0821199 B1 20001115; AT 197639 T 20001215; DE 69703519 D1 20001221; DE 69703519 T2 20010607; ES 2153169 T3 20010216; FR 2751730 A1 19980130; FR 2751730 B1 19981009

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030723

2004-04-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040201

2004-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-10 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030722

2004-02-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040203

2004-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040201

2004-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. SAUNIER DUVAL EAU CHAUDE CHAUFFAGE *SDECC

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-23 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-07-22 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030722

2003-07-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030722

2002-08-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020828

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020731

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020729

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-07-25 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020725

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-07-17 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020717

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-07-04 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020704

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-07-01 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020701

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2153169 T3

2000-12-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69703519 20001221

2000-12-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001123

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB NL

2000-11-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 197639 T 20001215

2000-03-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000121

1998-10-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB NL

1998-09-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980703

1998-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE