Global Patent Index - EP 0821205 B1

EP 0821205 B1 2000-12-06 - Safety-grill

Title (en)

Safety-grill

Title (de)

Objektsicherungsgitter

Title (fr)

Grille de sécurité

Publication

EP 0821205 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97104866 A

Priority

DE 19625656 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0821205A2] The grating comprises parallel profiled bars (6) with openings (81,82) through which the cross-struts pass. Spacers (11) on the struts hold the bars apart and have end edges (13) which are bent over. The struts can be cast, and of polymer concrete. On the outdoor side there can be a further grating, to which the free edges of the bars are welded. On the indoor side there can be a de-mister, typically situated between two sets of bars. This may be of woven steel, separating droplets from a highly-humid current of gas.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 13/20; E06B 9/01; F24F 13/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/01 (2006.01); F24F 13/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/01 (2013.01); F24F 13/082 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19625656 A1 19980102; DE 19625656 C2 20010222; AT 197990 T 20001215; AT 250203 T 20031015; EP 0821205 A2 19980128; EP 0821205 A3 19990217; EP 0821205 B1 20001206; EP 0965800 A2 19991222; EP 0965800 A3 20000628; EP 0965800 B1 20030917

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160331

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160323

- Year of fee payment: 20

2001-12-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2001-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-11-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-01-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702708 20010111

2000-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-12-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: HEPP, WENGER & RYFFEL AG

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI

2000-12-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 197990 T 20001215

1999-06-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990511

1999-04-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990222

1999-02-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI

1999-02-17 [RHK1] MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F24F 13/20

1998-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI