Global Patent Index - EP 0821212 B1

EP 0821212 B1 2001-12-05 - Heat exchanger

Title (en)

Heat exchanger

Title (de)

Wärmeaustauscher

Title (fr)

Echangeur de chaleur

Publication

EP 0821212 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97109258 A

Priority

DE 19630482 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0821212A2] The heat exchanger tubes (2) in the area of their windings are held statically. The area of the heat exchange tubes between the windings is in contact with a knock tube. Jolting type movements of the knock tube produce vibrations in the heat exchange tubes. The knock tube (8) in the area of contact with the heat exchange tubes runs somewhat vertically to the heat exchanger tubes, can be connected to them, can be multiply wound and elastically movable. With the knock tube a thruster (10) is connected, and is fitted outwardly through the wall of the hot gas channel (1). The heat exchange tubes are connected to collection chambers (7) for the inward feed and evacuation of cool fluid, e.g. water, water vapour, air or oil.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28D 7/08; F28G 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28D 7/08 (2006.01); F28G 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28D 7/085 (2013.01); F28D 7/08 (2013.01); F28G 7/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0821212 A2 19980128; EP 0821212 A3 19980916; EP 0821212 B1 20011205; DE 19630482 A1 19980129

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090607

2010-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100226

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090607

2010-01-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080620

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080613

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080620

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080613

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-18 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2008-01-18 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2008-01-09 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2007-10-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: LENTJES GMBH

- Free text: MG TECHNOLOGIES AG#BOCKENHEIMER LANDSTRASSE 73-77#60325 FRANKFURT AM MAIN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- LENTJES GMBH#DANIEL-GOLDBACH-STRASSE 19#40880 RATINGEN (DE)

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020307

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705630 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010404

2001-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MG TECHNOLOGIES AG

1999-05-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB LI

1999-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

1999-05-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990316

1999-01-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: METALLGESELLSCHAFT AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

1998-09-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI