Global Patent Index - EP 0821317 A3

EP 0821317 A3 2000-11-08 - Method and system for decoding distorted image and symbology data

Title (en)

Method and system for decoding distorted image and symbology data

Title (de)

Verfahren und System zum Dekodieren von Bild- und Symboldaten

Title (fr)

Procédé et système de décodage de données d'images et de symboles

Publication

EP 0821317 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 97305266 A

Priority

US 68712496 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0821317A2] Disclosed is a system and method for reading and decoding distorted data, e.g., bar code label or other symbology data, by fitting a scanned signal model j(t, ), using a Deterministic Expectation-Maximization (DEM) algorithm, to the measured or detected data signal y(t). The DEM algorithm, which is a novel variation of the conventional Expectation-Maximization (EM) algorithm, enables the system and method according to the invention to determine the values of a plurality of parameters defining the scanned signal model j(t, ) as it is being fitted to the measured data signal y(t). Based on these values, characteristic information such as data elements or symbols encoded within the image data are generated using conventional signal processing techniques. The use of the DEM algorithm advantageously deblurs the signal by reducing the effects of intersymbol interference. In an alternative embodiment, the DEM algorithm is supplemented by a conventional zero crossings decoding technique. In this manner, the zero crossings technique is used to obtain initial parameter estimates for the DEM algorithm in determining the parameters of the scanned signal model j(t, ). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06K 7/14; G06K 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06K 7/00 (2006.01); G06K 7/10 (2006.01); G06K 7/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06K 7/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] EP 0634730 A2 19950118 - SICK OPTIK ELEKTRONIK ERWIN [DE]
  • [X] ZHENGRONG LIANG ET AL: "PARAMETER ESTIMATION AND TISSUE SEGMENTATION FROM MULTISPECTRAL MR IMAGES", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MEDICAL IMAGING,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, VOL. 13, NR. 3, PAGE(S) 441-449, ISSN: 0278-0062, XP000474134

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0821317 A2 19980128; EP 0821317 A3 20001108; JP H1091714 A 19980410; US 5780830 A 19980714

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030822

2003-05-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030411

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010425

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

2000-11-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 06K 7/14 A, 7G 06K 7/10 B

1998-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-01-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI