Global Patent Index - EP 0821330 B1

EP 0821330 B1 2002-09-04 - Smoke detector

Title (en)

Smoke detector

Title (de)

Rauchmelder

Title (fr)

Détecteur de fumée

Publication

EP 0821330 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96111751 A

Priority

EP 96111751 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0821330A1] The smoke detector has a fixing socket in which a detector insert with an optical module is fitted. The optical module has a light source (6) and a photodetector (7) contained within a measuring chamber having a base (11). The module further has a labyrinth system provided by plates (9) projecting inwards from the periphery of the measuring chamber. The base of the measuring chamber has a conical or pyramid shape so that its centre lies at a greater distance from the plane containing the light source and the photodetector than its periphery.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 17/107

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 17/10 (2006.01); G08B 17/107 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 17/107 (2013.01); G08B 17/113 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0821330 A1 19980128; EP 0821330 B1 20020904; AT 223604 T 20020915; AU 3332797 A 19980210; AU 725418 B2 20001012; CN 1135511 C 20040121; CN 1198236 A 19981104; DE 59609625 D1 20021010; ES 2183899 T3 20030401; KR 100467130 B1 20050602; KR 20000064238 A 20001106; PL 184244 B1 20020930; PL 325921 A1 19980817; RU 2189080 C2 20020910; WO 9803946 A1 19980129; ZA 9705811 B 19980204

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150723

2016-08-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160826

2016-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150801

2016-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150722

2016-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150731

2016-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150731

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150722

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160202

2016-04-06 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150801

2016-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150722

2016-02-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59609625

2015-03-18 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20150220 AND 20150225

2015-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20141009

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140730

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-11-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140814

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140709

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140919

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20140703

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-05-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130722

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 223604 T

- Effective date: 20130722

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110723

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120615

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120802

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-05-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110722

2012-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-03-06 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SIEMENS BUILDING TECHNOLOGIES A.G.

- Effective date: 20110731

2011-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20100720

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-11-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20100713

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100713

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-06-10 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090514 AND 20090520

2007-02-28 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SIEMENS BUILDING TECHNOLOGIES AG C-IPR

- Free text: SIEMENS BUILDING TECHNOLOGIES AG#BELLERIVESTRASSE 36#8034 ZUERICH (CH) -TRANSFER TO- SIEMENS BUILDING TECHNOLOGIES AG C-IPR#GUBELSTRASSE 22#6300 ZUG (CH)

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2183899 T3

2003-03-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59609625 20021010

2002-09-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 223604 T 20020915

2001-01-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS BUILDING TECHNOLOGIES AG

2000-09-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000809

1999-05-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS BUILDING TECHNOLOGIES AG

1998-10-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

1998-09-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980721

1998-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

1998-01-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;SI