Global Patent Index - EP 0821383 B1

EP 0821383 B1 2003-06-04 - Overcurrent trip unit for an electrical installation device, particularly for a circuit breaker

Title (en)

Overcurrent trip unit for an electrical installation device, particularly for a circuit breaker

Title (de)

Überstromauslöser für ein elektrisches Installationsgerät, insbesondere für einen Leitungsschutzschalter

Title (fr)

Déclencheur de surintensité pour un appareil électrique, en particulier pour un disjoncteur de protection

Publication

EP 0821383 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97112479 A

Priority

DE 19629960 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0821383A2] The overcurrent release uses a thermal release with a bimetallic strip (12) exhibiting an additional snap-action movement upon heating. The bimetallic strip is secured at one end (19) so that its free end (24) is deflected further upon further heating after the snap-action movement. The bimetallic strip can be secured to the end of a yoke arm (18) of an electromagnetic release (11) extending parallel to the coil axis, with a pin (22) projecting from the yoke arm to provide a bridge between the latter and the bimetallic strip.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 71/40; H01H 71/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/16 (2006.01); H01H 71/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/40 (2013.01); H01H 71/16 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0821383 A2 19980128; EP 0821383 A3 19990107; EP 0821383 B1 20030604; AT 242544 T 20030615; DE 19629960 A1 19980129

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080719

2009-05-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090331

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080722

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070710

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070723

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-04-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ABB PATENT G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-19 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030719

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59710197 P 20030710

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR IT

2001-11-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011016

2001-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB PATENT GMBH

1999-09-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE DE FR IT

1999-04-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990209

1999-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR IT