Global Patent Index - EP 0821561 B1

EP 0821561 B1 2000-06-28 - THREADING OF A FLAT MATERIAL STRIPS INTO A TOWEL DISPENSER

Title (en)

THREADING OF A FLAT MATERIAL STRIPS INTO A TOWEL DISPENSER

Title (de)

EINFÄDELUNG VON FLÄCHIGEM BANDMATERIAL IN EINEM HANDTUCHSPENDER

Title (fr)

INSERTION DU DEBUT D'UNE BANDE PLATE DE MATERIAU DANS UN DISTRIBUTEUR D'ESSUIE-MAINS

Publication

EP 0821561 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96908987 A

Priority

  • CH 9600141 W
  • CH 112195 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9632874A1] Towel dispensers installed in public washrooms have the disavantage of being cumbersome to handle, in particular when exchanging used towel rollers. In the disclosed process, the beginning of a towel is threaded for example by closing the lid of the apparatus, triggering a movement or rotation and guiding and rolling the towel after forming a loop. An appropriate device has roller (7, 8 ,11), a roller (7) mounted on the rear wall and a roller (11) mounted on the side wall of the dispenser (1). Conveyor and guiding elements (14; 15) separate clean material (2) from used material (2'). The invention may be combined with known components of already installed towel dispensers, providing the same with an automatic towel threading capacity.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 10/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 10/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 10/28 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9632874 A1 19961024; AT 194059 T 20000715; AU 5267196 A 19961107; CA 2217371 A1 19961024; CH 689782 A5 19991115; CN 1099272 C 20030122; CN 1182356 A 19980520; CZ 9703171 A3 19990113; DE 59605510 D1 20000803; EP 0821561 A1 19980204; EP 0821561 B1 20000628; HK 1005219 A1 20010123; HU 9801588 A2 19981130; HU 9801588 A3 19990329; JP 3710819 B2 20051026; JP H11503634 A 19990330; KR 100418690 B1 20040623; NO 325196 B1 20080218; NO 974825 A 19971017; NO 974825 D0 19971017; PL 322902 A1 19980302; SK 141397 A3 19980909; US 6267460 B1 20010731

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160416

2016-06-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 194059 T

- Effective date: 20160417

2016-05-11 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20160416

2016-04-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-04-20 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20160416

2016-04-17 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59605510

2015-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150423

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150429

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150423

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150427

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150424

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20150427

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150526

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150506

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150424

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-04-13 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: CWS INTERNATIONAL AG

- Free text: CWS INTERNATIONAL AG#OBERNEUHOFSTRASSE 5#CH-6340 BAAR (CH) -TRANSFER TO- CWS INTERNATIONAL AG#OBERNEUHOFSTRASSE 5#CH-6340 BAAR (CH)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010430

2001-04-17 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010417

2001-04-04 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2001-03-09 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010309

2000-09-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000929

2000-09-28 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000928

2000-09-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000928

2000-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000928

2000-09-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-09-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. ZINI MARANESI & C. S.R.L.

2000-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605510 20000803

2000-07-26 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-07-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-06-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PPS POLYVALENT PATENT SERVICE AG

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 194059 T 20000715

1999-11-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990927

1998-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971023

1998-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE