Global Patent Index - EP 0821589 B1

EP 0821589 B1 2009-02-04 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS TO PREVENT TOXICITY INDUCED BY NONSTEROIDAL ANTIINFLAMMATORY DRUGS

Title (en)

COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS TO PREVENT TOXICITY INDUCED BY NONSTEROIDAL ANTIINFLAMMATORY DRUGS

Title (de)

MITTEL UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERHINDERUNG DER DURCH NICHTSTEROIDALE ANTIINFLAMMATORISCHE ARZNEISTOFFE VERURSACHTEN TOXIZITÄT

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS ET PROCEDES PERMETTANT D'EMPECHER LA TOXICITE INDUITE PAR LES MEDICAMENTS ANTI-INFLAMMATOIRES NON STEROIDIENS

Publication

EP 0821589 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96911685 A

Priority

  • US 9604931 W
  • US 42509095 A
  • US 54320895 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9632946A1] Nonsteroidal antiinflammatory drugs which have been substituted with a nitrogen monoxide group; compositions comprising: (i) a nonsteroidal antiinflammatory drug, which can optionally be substituted with a nitrogen monoxide group and (ii) a compound that directly donates, transfers or releases a nitrogen monoxide group (preferably as a charged species, particularly nitrosonium); and methods of treatment of inflammation, pain, gastrointestinal lesions and/or fever using the compositions are disclosed. The compounds and compositions protect against the gastrointestinal, renal and other toxicities that are otherwise induced by nonsteroidal antiinflammatory drugs.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/54 (2006.01); C07D 417/04 (2006.01); A61K 31/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/19 (2006.01); A61K 31/403 (2006.01); A61K 31/404 (2006.01); A61K 31/405 (2006.01); A61K 31/541 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61P 1/00 (2006.01); A61P 1/04 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07C 203/00 (2006.01); C07C 327/28 (2006.01); C07C 381/00 (2006.01); C07D 209/28 (2006.01); C07D 417/12 (2006.01); C07D 513/00 (2006.01); C07D 513/02 (2006.01); C07D 513/04 (2006.01); C07J 41/00 (2006.01); C07K 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 417/12 (2013.01); A61K 31/343 (2013.01); A61K 31/60 (2013.01); C07C 203/00 (2013.01); C07C 327/28 (2013.01); C07C 381/00 (2013.01); C07D 209/28 (2013.01); C07J 41/0055 (2013.01); C07K 5/0215 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. A61K 31/343 + A61K 2300/00
  2. A61K 31/60 + A61K 2300/00

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9632946 A1 19961024; AU 5449396 A 19961107; AU 710951 B2 19990930; CA 2218555 A1 19961024; CA 2218555 C 20030923; EP 0821589 A1 19980204; EP 0821589 A4 20020515; EP 0821589 B1 20090204; JP 2007291127 A 20071108; JP H11509519 A 19990824; US 2003109520 A1 20030612; US 2005038029 A1 20050217; US 2006276439 A1 20061207; US 2008275010 A1 20081106; US 5703073 A 19971230; US 6043233 A 20000328; US 6048858 A 20000411; US 6057347 A 20000502; US 6083515 A 20000704; US 6323234 B1 20011127; US 6482846 B1 20021119; US 6790864 B2 20040914

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111102

2012-07-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69637830

- Effective date: 20111102

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110411

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110411

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2012-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110430

2012-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110430

2012-01-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111230

2011-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110411

2011-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100426

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-10-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100426

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100428

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100428

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100506

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-03-12 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2010-01-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091105

2009-09-09 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090813 AND 20090819

2009-08-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090504

2009-03-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69637830 P 20090319

2009-02-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2009-02-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-08-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 31/54 20060101AFI20080702BHEP

2008-08-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C07D 513/00 20060101ALI20080702BHEP

2008-08-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C07D 513/02 20060101ALI20080702BHEP

2008-08-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C07D 513/04 20060101ALI20080702BHEP

2008-08-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61P 29/00 20060101ALI20080702BHEP

2007-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030303

2003-04-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030303

2002-05-15 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020328

2002-05-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

1998-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971024

1998-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE