Global Patent Index - EP 0821592 A4

EP 0821592 A4 2000-03-01 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR REGULATING HAIR GROWTH

Title (en)

COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR REGULATING HAIR GROWTH

Title (de)

ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR REGULATION DER HAARWACHSTUMS

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS ET PROCEDES DE REGULATION DE LA CROISSANCE DES CHEVEUX

Publication

EP 0821592 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96912950 A

Priority

  • US 9605492 W
  • US 42578695 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9632961A1] A method of modulating hair growth by contacting selected cells with a selected growth-modulating molecule is provided. A method for hair reconstitution or transplantation by expanding selected cells in vitro and combining them with other cells that regulate hair growth are also provided. Compositions containing a growth-modulating molecule which is synthesized by follicular cells and which undergoes hair-cycle-dependent concentration changes in hair follicles are also provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 38/48; C12N 5/00; A61K 38/57; A61K 38/19; A61K 35/36; A61K 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 38/22 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C12N 5/071 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 5/0627 (2013.01); C12N 2501/998 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [DA] WO 9501423 A1 19950112 - UNIV PENNSYLVANIA [US], et al
  • [A] S. ARASE ET AL.: "CO-CULTURE OF HUMAN HAIR FOLLICLES AND DERMAL PAPILLAE IN A COLLAGEN MATRIX.", THE JOURNAL OF DERMATOLOGY, vol. 17, no. 11, November 1990 (1990-11-01), TOKYO, JP, pages 667 - 676, XP000857988
  • [PX] D.-W. YU ET AL.: "MESSAGE OF NEXIN 1, A SERINE PROTEASE INHIBITOR, IS ACCUMULATED IN THE FOLLICULAR PAPILLA DURING ANAGEN OF THE HAIR CYCLE.", JOURNAL OF CELL SCIENCE, vol. 108, no. 12, December 1995 (1995-12-01), LONDON, GB, pages 3867 - 3874, XP000857962
  • See also references of WO 9632961A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9632961 A1 19961024; CA 2216870 A1 19961024; CA 2216870 C 20021119; EP 0821592 A1 19980204; EP 0821592 A4 20000301; JP H11504016 A 19990406; MX 9708045 A 19980331

INPADOC legal status


2011-01-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100714

2010-12-03 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1008490

2007-01-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021024

2002-12-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021024

2000-03-01 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000118

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 38/48 A, 7C 12N 5/00 B, 7A 61K 38/57 B, 7A 61K 38/19 B, 7A 61K 35/36 B, 7A 61K 7/06 B

1998-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971027

1998-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE