Global Patent Index - EP 0821720 B1

EP 0821720 B1 2000-03-22 - ANTI-FOAMING COMPOSITION

Title (en)

ANTI-FOAMING COMPOSITION

Title (de)

ENTSCHÄUMUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION ANTI-MOUSSE

Publication

EP 0821720 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96915060 A

Priority

  • FR 9600600 W
  • FR 9504827 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9633255A1] The invention concerns an anti-foaming composition comprising at least one defoaming non-ionic surfactant and at least one alkylpolyglycoside of formula (I): ROZn, in which R is a 2-ethylhexyl radical, Z is a saccharoid residue, and n is between 1 and 5. The invention also concerns a cleaning composition comprising an anti-foaming composition of this type.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 1/825

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 17/56 (2006.01); C11D 1/825 (2006.01); C11D 1/835 (2006.01); C11D 3/00 (2006.01); C11D 1/44 (2006.01); C11D 1/66 (2006.01); C11D 1/72 (2006.01); C11D 1/722 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/825 (2013.01); C11D 1/8255 (2013.01); C11D 1/8355 (2013.01); C11D 3/0026 (2013.01); C11D 1/44 (2013.01); C11D 1/662 (2013.01); C11D 1/72 (2013.01); C11D 1/721 (2013.01); C11D 1/722 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9633255 A1 19961024; AU 5696496 A 19961107; DE 69607338 D1 20000427; DE 69607338 T2 20000907; DE 69607338 T3 20040527; EP 0821720 A1 19980204; EP 0821720 B1 20000322; EP 0821720 B2 20030813; ES 2144744 T3 20000616; FR 2733246 A1 19961025; FR 2733246 B1 19970523; JP H11503784 A 19990330; US 6015839 A 20000118; US 6337352 B1 20020108

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150421

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150420

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090419

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090419

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091103

2009-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090419

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080331

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080320

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080320

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-12-03 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2003-12-02 [REG SE RPEO] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN MODIFIED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO

2003-11-24 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031124

2003-08-13 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20030813

2003-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-04-04 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030404

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-10-09 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: AKZO NOBEL N.V. * 20001221 COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Effective date: 20001218

2002-09-25 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: AKZO NOBEL N.V. * 20001221 COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Effective date: 20001218

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-02-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: AKZO NOBEL N.V.

- Effective date: 20001218

2001-02-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Effective date: 20001221

2001-02-07 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: AKZO NOBEL N.V.

- Effective date: 20001218

2000-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2144744 T3

2000-05-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000417

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69607338 20000427

2000-04-18 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: PROROGA CONCESSA IN DATA: 16.06.2000;JACOBACCI & P

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990618

1998-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971121

1998-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE